Frankenmuth Insurance Company et al v. Koorsen Fire & Security et al
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Insurance Company, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, as subrogee of Kentucky Orthopaedics & Spine, LLC and Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, as subrogee of Grau Properties, LLC
Defendant: Koorsen Fire & Security, Campbell's Home Security, Inc. and Koorsen Fire & Security, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv00333
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. NLT 5/1/2024 parties exchange Rule 26(a)(1) not previously exchanged; 2. NLT 11/1/2024 plaintiff disclose expert witnesses, NLT 12/2/2024 defendant disclose same; 3. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due within 30 days of the discovery of new information, but by NLT 30 days prior to close of discovery; 4. Discovery due by 1/10/2025; 5. All discovery disputes referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge (Stinnett) by random draw; 6. All motions for extension of time referred to undersigned for disposition; 7. Parties may not, by agreement, extend deadlines in scheduling order or for responding to motions; 8. Motions to Amended Pleadings & to Join Additional Parties due by 1/31/2025; 9. Dispositive Motions and daubert motions due by 2/7/2025; 10. By 3/4/2025 parties file witness lists, exhibit lists, and pretrial memorandum; 12. By 3/12/2025 parties pre-mark & number all exhibits to be used at trial and exchange with opposing counsel; 13. Objections due by 3/18/2025; 14. Pretrial filings listed above may be submitted to chambers at email listed; 15. By 3/25/2025 parties are directed to submit to Chambers a copy of each exhibit; 16. JURY TRIAL set for 4/8/2025 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves, counsel present at 8:30 a.m. (5 days); 17. Parties may request a pretrial conference as appropriate closer to trial date; 18. Parties are directed to file a joint status report the 1st Monday of each month; 19. Parties are directed to use the services of a private mediator in the even they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/29/2024.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC
January 29, 2024 Filing 21 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bolen, James)
January 15, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Koorsen Fire & Security, Inc..(Bolen, James) Modified text on 1/16/2024 (KM).
January 12, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Koorsen Fire & Security, Inc..(Bolen, James)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul R. Bartalocci. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/12/2024. (KMP)cc: COR
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William N. Clark, Jr.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/12/2024. (KMP) cc: COR
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for William N. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frankenmuth Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5741603) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of William N. Clark)(Mayer, Christopher)
January 12, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Paul R. Bartalocci to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frankenmuth Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number CKYEDC-5741578) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mayer, Christopher)
January 12, 2024 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Paul R. Bartolacci, William N. Clark, Jr re #18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (KMP)
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Koorsen Fire & Security. (Bolen, James)
December 27, 2023 Attorney Update. Attorney Crystal D. King for Koorsen Fire & Security, Inc.,Crystal D. King for Koorsen Fire & Security, Inc. added. (JLM)
December 26, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James David Bolen. #8 Stipulation has been filed by Koorsen Fire & Security without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLM)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. W/in 30 days, parties meet; 2. At meeting, parties exchange disclosures; 3. W/in 14 days after meeting, file report. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/26/23. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(JLM)cc: COR
December 26, 2023 Attorney Update. Attorney James David Bolen, Jr for Koorsen Fire & Security,James David Bolen, Jr for Koorsen Fire & Security added. (JLM)
December 22, 2023 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Campbell's Home Security, Inc.. (Fore, Michael)
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Koorsen Fire & Security by Campbell's Home Security, Inc..(Fore, Michael)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER:The parties' construed motion for an extension of time #8 is GRANTED. The defendant's deadline to respond to plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/15/24.Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/21/2023.(KCF)cc: COR
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Koorsen Fire & Security. (Bolen, James)
December 18, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Filing of Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint by Frankenmuth Insurance Company as to Koorsen Fire & Security served on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Koorsen)(Mayer, Christopher) Modified text on 12/19/2023 (KM).
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Campbell's Home Security, Inc., Koorsen Fire & Security (including attested copies of the complaint and certified mail return receipts) for service through Kentucky Secretary of State and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Campbell's Home Security, Inc.)(KCF)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING: Civil Summons by Frankenmuth Insurance Company (KCF)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mills Mayer on behalf of Frankenmuth Insurance Company. (KCF)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frankenmuth Insurance Company. (KCF)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5712213), filed by Frankenmuth Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Koorsen Fire & Security, Inc., #2 Summons Campbell's Home Security, Inc., #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KCF)
December 6, 2023 Conflict Check run. (KCF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankenmuth Insurance Company et al v. Koorsen Fire & Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Mills Mayer
Represented By: Paul R. Bartolacci
Represented By: William N. Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, as subrogee of Kentucky Orthopaedics & Spine, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Mills Mayer
Represented By: Paul R. Bartolacci
Represented By: William N. Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, as subrogee of Grau Properties, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Mills Mayer
Represented By: Paul R. Bartolacci
Represented By: William N. Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koorsen Fire & Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell's Home Security, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scott Fore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koorsen Fire & Security, Inc.
Represented By: Crystal D. King
Represented By: James David Bolen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?