Gardner v. Commonwealth of Kentucky
Petitioner: Troy Gardner
Respondent: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 5:2024cv00066
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATEMENT OF CASE by Troy Gardner. (Attachments: #1 envelope dated 3/26/2024)(KMP)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Troy Gardner, pro se. (KCF)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Troy Gardner, pro se. Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (KCF)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Troy Gardner, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope PM 3-21-24)(KCF)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for review: #8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for review: re #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Troy Gardner (KCF)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Troy Gardner. (KMP)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Troy Gardner, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 envelope, not dated, #4 cover letter)(KMP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2024: #5 Affidavit of Indigency) (KMP).
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Edward B. Atkins for review: #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Troy Gardner (KMP)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER:1. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Petitioner Troy Gardner sufficient copies of AO241 and AO240;2. Petitioner, Troy Garner, shall have until 4/5/24 to file the appropriate Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus on this Court's official form;3. Petitioner shall have until 4/5/24 to pay the applicable filing fee or submit a completed Application to Proceed W/out Prepayment of Fees form, along w/ necessary attachments as identified in this Order;4. Petitioner shall keep the Court informed of his current mailing address. Failure to notify the Clerk of Court of any address change may result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 03/08/2024.(KCF)cc: CORand Troy Gardner by US Mail/Forms Mailed
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Enjoin by Troy Gardner, pro se. Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (KCF)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KCF)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (No Filing Fee Received), filed by Troy Gardner, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Service Form, #2 Envelope PM 3-1-24)(KCF)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (KCF)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for review: re #4 MOTION to Enjoin by Troy Gardner (KCF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?