New London Tobacco Market, Inc. v. Kentucky Fuel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: New London Tobacco Market, Inc.
Defendant: Kentucky Fuel Corporation and James C. Justice Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv00091
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: Laurel
Presiding Judge: Gregory F. VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration [R. 447 ] is DENIED; 2. Defendants' Motion for Oral Argument [R. 450 ] is DENIED; 3. Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11 [R. 457 ] is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs are awarded monetary sanctions against the Getty Law Group and Mr. Richard Getty in the amount of $10,000.00; 4. Defendants SHALL PAY Plaintiffs the $10,000.00 owed as sanctions within th irty (30) days of the entry of this Order, and are hereby ADMONISHED not to present misleading and frivolous arguments to the Court in the future; 5. Plaintiffs' Statement of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Costs [R. 448 ] is ACCEPTED; 6. Defendants SHALL PAY $838,316.03 in fees and expenses to John Lucas's firm, $103,423.13 in fees and expenses to Scott Websters firm, $40,659.41 in fees and expenses due to Culver Schmid's firm, and $59,098.00 in fees and expenses due to Plaintiffs, for a combined total $1,041,496.57 in fees and expenses; and 7. Judgment shall enter contemporaneously. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 04/24/2020.(KJA)cc: COR
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 437 Report and Recommendations: 1) For Count I, as of June 26, 2019, Defendants owe $970,000 in unpaid retainer fees. That amount continues to increase by $10,000 on the first of each mont h. Therefore, Defendants currently owe $1,000,000, compoundedannually at 8% interest; 2) For Count II, Defendants owe $16,990,900 in lost tonnage royalties, asdetermined by the independent arbiter, with pre-judgement interestcompounded annually at 8% interest, beginning May 1, 2012;3. As compensatory damages under Count V, Defendants owe $20,000 for theStrong Brothers lease reimbursements, plus 8% interest beginning October 14,2011 for the first $5,000; October 4, 2012 for the second $5,000 payment;November 22, 2013 for the third $5,000 payment; and April 28, 2016 for thefourth $5,000 payment. In addition to the foregoing, Defendants also owe$17,010,900 in punitive damages, without inte rest: 4. Under Section 14 of the Fourth Amendment, Defendants owe "all attorney fees and expenses in connection with this lawsuit, without interest. Within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs SHALL FILE an affidavit of fees and c osts, and Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days to respond. 5. Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Sanctions [R. 378] is DENIED; and 6. Defendants' Motion for leave to file a Sur-Reply [R. 431] is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/23/19.(MRS)cc: COR
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MEMORANDUM,OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, and the Court being sufficiently advised, Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal [R. 388 under 28 U.S.C. § 144 and § 455 is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/28/18. (MRS) cc: COR,
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Plas' objs 348 are OVERRULED and the parties are directed to comply with MJ Ingram's decision at 345 ; 2) Plas' motion for leave to respond to dfts' 351 is DENIED; 3) MJ shall schedule an evidentiary hearing at his convenience; 4) Plas' motion for sanctions 356 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/27/18.(MRS)cc: COR
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: This Court DENIES the Defendants Motion to Set Aside Default 304 . See Burrell, 434 F.3d at 831-32. Further proceedings regarding damages will be managed by the Magistrate.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/23/2017. (JMB)cc: COR
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) The Magistrate's Recommended Disposition 302 as to Pla's Renewed Motion Under Rule 55 is DENIED; 2) Dfts' first objection to the Magistrate's Recommended Disposition 305 requesting an evidentiar y hearing is SUSTAINED and their other objs are DENIED as MOOT; 3) Pla's Renewed Motion Under Rule 55 270 is DISMISSED w/out PREJUDICE pending an evidentiary hearing w/parties to follow direction from Judge Ingram as to refiling; and 4) The case is referred to Magistrate Hanly A. Ingram to conduct an evidentiary hearing to assess damages in accordance w/this Order. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/31/17.(MRS)cc: COR
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Magistrate's R/R 259 is ADOPTED as and for the opinion of the Court; 2) Plas' Supplemental Motion for Atty Fees 240 is GRANTED in PART; 3) Court HEREBY AWARDS the Plas $109,789.75 in fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 07/20/2016.(MRS)cc: COR
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The Magistrate's Recommended Disposition [R. 189 is ADOPTED as and for the Opinion of the Court; 2. As such, Plaintiffs motions filed at Docket Entries 131, 134, and 170 SHALL BE GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PA RT as is consistent with the Report and Recommendation and this Order. Specifically, default judgment is GRANTED as to liability on Counts I, II, and V. As the Plaintiffs did not sufficiently tie their discovery-related injuries to the merits of the claims in Count III and IV, that Plaintiffs motions are denied as to those claims; 3. The Court will hold a hearing at a later date on the issue of what award of expenses, including attorney's fees, is appropriate; 4. The Defendants' Motion to Strike [R. 199 is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority at Docket Entry 198 is STRICKEN from the Record; and, 5. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [R. 125 is DENIED as MOOT as to Counts I and II and DENIED on the MERITS as to Count IV. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 09/30/2014.(MRS)cc: COR
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Having considered the record, applicable law and the arguments of the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS the Defendants' motion to dismiss Count Five [R. 44] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 12/16/2013.(MRS)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New London Tobacco Market, Inc. v. Kentucky Fuel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New London Tobacco Market, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Lucas
Represented By: Scott Marlow Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Fuel Corporation
Represented By: Billy R. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Justice Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Billy R. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?