Journey Acquisition-II, L.P. v. EQT Production Company

Plaintiff: Journey Acquisition-II, L.P.
Defendant: EQT Production Company
Counter_claimant: EQT Production Company
Counter_defendant: Journey Acquisition-II, L.P.
Case Number: 6:2012cv00108
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: London Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: Gregory F. VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2015 221 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Journey' Motion for Judgment [R. 204 ] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2. EQT's Motion for New Trial and For Judgment as a Matter of Law [R. 198 ] is DENIED; 3. Judgment will be entered in favor of Journey, and Journey will be awarded the amount of damages stipulated to by the parties concerning the Further Assurances Wells and the Trespass Wells; 4. Journey will be awarded prejudgment interest on the damages related to the Further Assura nces Wells at 8% compounded annually from July 1, 2001 until the present, and will be awarded prejudgment interest on the trespass damages at 8% simple from December 15, 2006 until December 15, 2011; and 5. This matter is continued until after the status conference which the Court will set by subsequent order. The Court will not enter Final Judgment in this case until after the status conference, which will address the final damages calculations and other outstanding issues still requiring the Court's resolution. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/25/2015.(RBB)cc: COR
June 24, 2015 220 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: ORDERED as follows: 1. EQT's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial [R. 198 ] is DENIED to the extent that it addresses the issue of willful trespass; and 2. Based on EQT's representations at Docket Entry No. 201 , Journey's Motion for a Hearing [R. 200 ] is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/24/2015.(RBB)cc: COR
August 18, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. EQT Production Company's Motion for Summary Judgment [R. 86 ] is DENIED; 2. EQT's accompanying Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages [R. 85 ] is GRANTED; 3. Journey Acquisition's First Motion for Par tial Summary Judgment [R. 87 ] is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART consistent with the findings of this opinion; 4. Journey Acquisition's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [R. 88 ] is GRANTED; 5. Journey Acquisition's Third Mot ion for Partial Summary Judgment [R. 89 ] is GRANTED; 6. Journey Acquisition's Fourth Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [R. 90 ] is GRANTED; and 7. This matter will remain on the Court's active docket pending resolution of the remaining issues, and thus the dates for the Final Pretrial Conference and the Jury Trial will remain as scheduled. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 8/18/14.(SYD)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Journey Acquisition-II, L.P. v. EQT Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Journey Acquisition-II, L.P.
Represented By: Wayne F. Collier
Represented By: Walker C. Friedman
Represented By: Jack E. Price, Jr.
Represented By: Christian D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT Production Company
Represented By: Nora Clevenger Price
Represented By: John Kevin West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: EQT Production Company
Represented By: Nora Clevenger Price
Represented By: John Kevin West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Journey Acquisition-II, L.P.
Represented By: Wayne F. Collier
Represented By: Walker C. Friedman
Represented By: Jack E. Price, Jr.
Represented By: Christian D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?