Kentucky Petroleum Operating LTD v. Golden et al
Plaintiff: Kentucky Petroleum Operating LTD
Defendant: Max L. Golden, Andrew Neil Golden, Macar Investments, LLC and 7921 Energy, LLC
Case Number: 6:2012cv00164
Filed: August 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: Laurel
Presiding Judge: Amul R. Thapar
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ORDERED that: (1) The KPO entities' motion to alter or amend judgment, R. 235 , is DENIED. (2) The KPO entities' motion to quash, R. 238 , is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 05/07/2015.(KJA)cc: COR
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Macar and 7921's motion for summary judgment, R. 115 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 3/4/2015.(RC)cc: COR
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1) Macar and 7921's motion for contempt sanctions, R. 63 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; 2) On September 5, 2014, at 11:30 a.m., the Court will hold a hearing at the U.S. Courthouse in London, Kentucky, to d etermine whether to issue civil contempt sanctions against the KPO defendants. Parties are responsible to have any necessary witnesses at the courthouse and ready to testify nlt 11:15 a.m.; 3) The KPO defendants' Motion to Quash the Writ of Garnishment, R. 75 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 8/19/2014.(RC)cc: COR
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) KPO's motion to quash R. 65 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) If KPO wishes to renew its motion to quash it must do so by Friday, June 13, 2014; 3) If KPO elects not to renew its motion the Court will order any property or proceeds of any debt belonging to KPO in Sunoco's possession applied upon the judgment pur Ky.Rev.Stat § 425.501(5); 4) By Friday, June 13, 2014, the KPO Entities must also file a sur-reply that addresses the le gal arguments made by 7921 and Macar in their reply brief in support of their motion for sanctions; 5) In the future, the Court will deny w/o prejudice any motion filed without adequate, on-point citations to precedent or other legal authority. Sur Reply due by 6/13/2014.) Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 5/30/2014.(RC)cc: COR
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1) The defendants' motion for summary judgment, R. 28, R. 34, is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 1/21/2014.(RC)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kentucky Petroleum Operating LTD v. Golden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Petroleum Operating LTD
Represented By: Darrell L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max L. Golden
Represented By: Gary W. Napier
Represented By: Drayer B. Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Neil Golden
Represented By: Gary W. Napier
Represented By: Drayer B. Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macar Investments, LLC
Represented By: Gary W. Napier
Represented By: Drayer B. Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7921 Energy, LLC
Represented By: Gary W. Napier
Represented By: Drayer B. Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?