Taylor et al v. University of the Cumberlands

Plaintiff: James Taylor and Dinah Taylor
Defendant: University of the Cumberlands
Case Number: 6:2016cv00109
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: Whitley
Presiding Judge: Gregory F. VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: First Motion [R. 107 at 2] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The communications between Dr. Taylor's counsel and Ms. Sue Wake are potentially relevant to bias and are an appropriate area for questioning by the Univ ersity. Second Motion [R. 107 at 2-3] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Third Motion [R. 107 at 4] is DENIED AS MOOT. Fourth Motion [R. 107 at 4-5] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. First and Second Motion [R. 111 at 3-6] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE . Third Motion [R. 111 at 7-9] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Fourth Motion [R. 111 at 9] is DENIED AS MOOT. Fifth Motion [R. 111 at 9-10] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Sixth Motion [R. 111 at 11-12] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Seventh Motion [R. 111 at 12-15] is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. First Motion [R. 106 at 3] is DENIED AS MOOT. Second and Third Motions [R. 106 at 3-4] are DENIED. First Motion [R. 108 at 1] is DENIED AS MOOT. Second Motion [R. 108 at 4-5] is GRANTE D. The Court OVERRULES the Universitys objections [R. 133 ] to Dr. Huff's testimony. Fourth Motion is GRANTED. Rulings on the University's Objections to the Taylors' Deposition Excerpts: First Objection [R. 133 ] is OVERRULED. See Section II.D. Second Objection [R. 133 ] is SUSTAINED. See Section II.D. Third Objection [R. 133 ] is SUSTAINED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 01/09/2019.(KJA)cc: COR Modified to create link on 1/10/2019 (KJA).
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS: 1. Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment [R. 112 ] is DENIED; and 2. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint or Reconsider Summary Judgment [R. 113 ] is DENIED; and 3. Plaintiffs' Motion to reduce Defendant's time for response is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/31/2018.(KJA)cc: COR
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [R. 70 ] is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART; 2. The Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [R. 70 ] is DENIED as to the Taylors' breach of contract claim ; and 3. The Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [R. 70 ] is GRANTED as to the Taylors' claims of slander, intentional infliction of emotional distress, reformation, and punitive damages. Motions terminated: 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment by University of the Cumberlands filed by University of the Cumberlands. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/7/2018.(RBB)cc: COR
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: the Taylors' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [R. 38 ] is DENIED. Motions terminated: 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dinah Taylor, James Taylor filed by Dinah Taylor, James Taylor. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 3/29/2018.(RBB)cc: COR
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim [R. 12] and the Supplemental Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim [R. 18] are GRANTED as to Count VII, "Termination of ERISA Prot ected Benefits, and Count VIII Unjust Enrichment." 2. The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim [R. 12 ] and the Supplemental Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim [R. 18 ] are DENIED as to all remaining cl aims. Motions terminated: 12 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by University of the Cumberlands filed by University of the Cumberlands, and 18 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by University of the Cumberlands filed by University of the Cumberlands. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 2/7/2017.(RBB)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. University of the Cumberlands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Taylor
Represented By: D. Duane Cook
Represented By: John M. Sosbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinah Taylor
Represented By: D. Duane Cook
Represented By: John M. Sosbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of the Cumberlands
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: Haley Trogdlen McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?