Hall v. Williamsburg, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Tristan James Hall
Defendant: City of Williamsburg, Kentucky, Wayne Bird, Allen Trimble, Robert Hammons, Jackie Steele, Richard Baxter, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Veracity Research Company and James Potter Wilder, Jr.
Case Number: 6:2016cv00304
Filed: December 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: Whitley
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Plaintiff Tristan Hall's post-judgment motions [Record Nos. 237, 238, 239, 240, 241, 242, 243, 244, 246, and 248] are DENIED. 2. Any future motions raising issues that have already been addressed by the Court will be summarily dismissed. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/18/18.(SYD)cc: COR, mailed to pro se filer
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The defendants' motion to dismiss [Record No. 224 ] is GRANTED. The claims asserted by Plaintiff Tristan Hall against Defendants Wayne Bird and City ofWilliamsburg, Kentucky, are DISMISSED, with prejudice, in t heir entirety. 2. The defendants' renewed motion for costs [Record No. 224 ] is GRANTED. The defendants will be awarded attorneys fees and costs in the amount of $3,040.50. 3. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Courts docket. 4. A corresponding Judgment shall be entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/27/18.(SYD)cc: COR, mailed to pro se filer
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1) Defendant Birds motion for judgment on the pleadings [Record No. 111] is GRANTED with respect to all claims against him in his official capacity; 2) Defendant Bird's motion for judgment on the pleadings [Record No. 111] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, with respect to the claims against him in his individual capacity, consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order. a. Judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED w/respect to Count II (Due Process), Coun t III (Behavior that Shocks the Conscience), Count IV (Civil Conspiracy), Count VI (Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress), Count VII (Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress), Count VIII (Negligence), Count X (Defamation), Count XI (False Imprisonment), Count XIII (Abuse of Process), and Count XIV (Respondeat Superior). b. Judgment on the pleadings is DENIED w/respect to Count 1 (Federal Malicious Prosecution) and Count XII (State Malicious Prosecution). 2) Defendant City of Williams burg's motion for judgment on the pleadings [Record No. 111] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order. a. Judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED w/respect to Count I(Federal Malicious Prosecution) , Count II (Due Process), Count III (Behavior that Shocks the Conscience), Count IV (Civil Conspiracy), Count VI (Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress), Count VII (Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress), Count VIII (Negligence), Count X (Defamation), Count XI (False Imprisonment), Count XIII (Abuse of Process), and Count XIV (Respondeat Superior). b. Judgment on the pleadings is DENIED w/respect to Count XII (State Malicious Prosecution). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/24/2017.(RC)cc: COR, paper copy to pro se filer via U.S. Mail
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM ORDER: 1) Plaintiff Hall's motion for reconsideration [Record No. 142], including his request for an evidentiary hearing is DENIED; 2) Plaintiff Hall's motion for sanctions [Record No. 145] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/10/2017.(RC)cc: COR, paper copy to pro se filer via U.S. Mail
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The Plaintiffs motion for discovery [Record No. 61 ] is DENIED. 2. Defendant Baxters motion to dismiss [Record No. 34 ] is GRANTED and the claims against him are DISMISSED. 3. Defendant Trimbles motion to dismiss [R ecord No. 36 ] is GRANTED and the claims against him are DISMISSED. 4. Defendant Steeles motion to dismiss [Record No. 38 ] is GRANTED and the claims against him are DISMISSED. 5. Defendant Hammonss motions to dismiss [Record No. 39 ] is GRANTED and the claims against him are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/24/17.(SYD)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Williamsburg, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan James Hall
Represented By: Michael Todd Cooper
Represented By: Hal D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Williamsburg, Kentucky
Represented By: Bridget L. Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Bird
Represented By: Bridget L. Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Trimble
Represented By: Steven Travis Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hammons
Represented By: Howard O. Mann
Represented By: Jason E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Steele
Represented By: Shandeep Jonathan Dutta
Represented By: Taylor Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Baxter
Represented By: Perry R. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veracity Research Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Potter Wilder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?