Henley Mining, Inc. v. Parton

Plaintiff: Henley Mining, Inc.
Defendant: David E. Parton
Case Number: 6:2017cv00092
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: Bell
Presiding Judge: Gregory F. VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER 7 MOTION to Dismiss by David E. Parton : The Court hereby ORDERS Defendant David E. Partons Motion to Dismiss [R. 7] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/26/19.(SYD)cc: COR
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Court's Order [R. 11 ] is GRANTED; 2. The Court's Order [R. 10 ] invoking Burford abstention is VACATED; 3. This action is RESTORED to the active docket; and 4. The Court shall reconsider Defendant David E. Parton's Motion to Dismiss. [R. 7 ]. A subsequent order reaching the merits of that motion shall issue at a later date. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 03/05/2019.(KJA)cc: COR
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: having considered the record, applicable law, and the arguments of the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS: 1. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED [R. 7 ]; 2. This case will be stricken from the court's active docket; and 3. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 3/28/2018.(RBB)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henley Mining, Inc. v. Parton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henley Mining, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Bowling
Represented By: Gillard B. Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Parton
Represented By: Jason Trent Ams
Represented By: Glenn Christopher Van Bever
Represented By: Rachel A. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?