Demirovic v. Moss et al
Plaintiff: Irfan Demirovic
Defendant: Ms. Bishop and David Moss
Case Number: 6:2018cv00193
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 4:18-cv-00102 Title : Demirovic v. Moss et al NOS : 550 (Prisoner: Civil Rights) Cause : 42:1983pr (42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights) Remarks: Motion to Appoint Counsel transferred (SYD)
July 26, 2018 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: 1) Irfan Demirovic's complaint [R. 1] is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2) Judgment is ENTERED in favor of defendants; 3) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/26/2018.(RC)cc: COR, paper copy of order to pro se plaintiff
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1) The Clerk of the Court shall MODIFY the docket to reflect "Irfan Demerovic" as an alternative designation for plaintiff; 2) Demirovic's complaint [R. 1] is DISMISSED with prejudice; 3) The Court will enter an appropriate Judgment contemporaneously with this Memorandum Opinion; 4) This matter is STRICKEN from the active docket. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/26/2018.(RC)cc: COR, paper copy of order to pro se plaintiff
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; 2. Because Demirovic has been granted pauper status in this proceeding, the $50.00 administrative fee is waived. 3. In light of his current inmate account balance, collection of the initial partial filing fee is DEFERRED. 4. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Demirovic's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525). 5. Each month Demirovics custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in an amount equal to 20% of his income. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/17/18. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 525) (SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer , Warden; Finance electronically. Modified on 7/17/2018 (SYD).
July 13, 2018 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Page)(SYD)
July 13, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (CBD)
July 13, 2018 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 4:18-cv-00102. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to Pla via US Mail
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/12/18: IT IS ORDERED that the instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Southern Division at London, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court.cc: Plaintiff(pro se), Clerk ED/KY (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 7/13/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Irfan Demirovic. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 7/13/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Irfan Demirovic (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 7/13/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 7/13/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bishop, David Moss, filed by Irfan Demirovic. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Summons) (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 7/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demirovic v. Moss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irfan Demirovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?