Roberts v. Morvac et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Shawn Roberts
Defendant: Bruse Piercy, David Morvac, Tim Koger, City of Monticello, KY, Harvey Shearer and Bruce Gregory
Case Number: 6:2018cv00196
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: 1. Roberts's #15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2. W/in (28) days, Roberts must pay $20.00 to the Clerk as an initial partial filing fee. 3. The Clerk shall open an acct in Roberts's name for rcpt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525) with (a) Roberts's name, (b) his inmate reg number, and (c) this case number. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form upon the Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Roberts is currently confined and upon the Office of the General Counsel for the Department of Corrections in Frankfort, Kentucky. 4. After the initial partial filing fee is paid, each month Roberts's custodian shall send the Clerk a payment in an amt equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund acct, but only if the amt in the acct exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 5. Roberts must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change in his mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 09/10/2018. (KJA)cc: COR, Finance, Order and EDKy 525 to Warden Daviess County Detention Center, Office General Counsel for Dept of Corrections, Frankfort, KY and pro se filer via US Mail Modified text on 9/10/2018 (KJA).
September 6, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PRO SE for review: re #15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Shawn Roberts (SYD)
September 6, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PRO SE for review: #14 Amended Complaint (SYD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 16 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dennis Shawn Roberts, PRO SE. (SYD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Shawn Roberts, PRO SE. Motions referred to P SO. (SYD)
September 6, 2018 Party Bruse Piercy terminated. (SYD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Monticello, KY, Tim Koger, David Morvac, Harvey Shearer, Bruce Gregory, filed by Dennis Shawn Roberts, PRO SE. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 9/5/18)(SYD)
August 22, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #13 Courtesy Copy of Order and Attachments Received from USDC Western District of Kentucky at Louisville. (KJA)
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 Courtesy Copy of Order and Attachments Received from USDC Western District of Kentucky at Louisville. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Deficiency, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Motion to Proceed IFP, #4 Witness List, #5 copy of mailing envelope from Western District (Louisville))(KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2018: #6 Inmate Account) (KJA).
August 15, 2018 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Dennis Shawn Roberts re #11 Letter: A courtesy copy of the docket sheet in the above-styled case is enclosed. If you would like a copy of any document previously filed in your record, please send a request to the Office of the Clerk noting the docket entry number for each copy requested. You will receive a response advising you of the total number of pages and the amount of money required to obtain the requested copies. Copies of the documents in your record will require a pre-payment of 50 cents per page. cc: Dennis Shawn Roberts by US Mail (KJA)
August 14, 2018 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dennis Shawn Roberts re #9 Order and Forms AO 240 and EDKY 520. Clerk re-mailed documents to pro se filer at 703 Old Bethel Road, Monticello, KY 42633. (KJA)
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Dennis Shawn Roberts, pro se, requesting the court to make a double of all legal documents and send to each address listed. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 08/10/2018) (KJA) Modified file date on 8/14/2018 (KJA). Modified text on 8/15/2018 (KJA).
August 2, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Shawn Roberts (pro se) Re: Address Change (Attachments: #1 copy of mailing env_front&back_postmark no legible) (RC)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1) Roberts's motion to proceed IFP #3 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) Clerk shall mark the case number on EDKY Form 520 and send to Roberts; 3) Clerk shall mark AL 240 and EDKY 523 Form and send to Roberts; 4) Should Roberts wish to pursue this claim, he must complete and file the complaint form; 5) In addition, Roberts MUST either pay the $400.00 filing and adm fees or have the Certificate of Inmate Acct certified by prison staff; 2) Complete the Affidavit of Assets; 6) Roberts must take these steps within 30 days or the case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 8/1/18. (Attachments: #1 AO 240 Form, #2 EDKY 520 Form)(MRS)cc: COR (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2018: #3 edky 523 form) (MRS).
July 19, 2018 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
July 19, 2018 Conflict Check run. (STC)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00455. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: Plt w/ copy of docket sheet
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/18/2018 - The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Southern Division at London, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. cc: Plaintiff-pro se; Clerk, Eastern District of Kentucky (DAK) [Transferred from kywd on 7/19/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: Motion to Proceed IFP not filled out nor Filing Fee Paid and Summons forms incomplete. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/13/2018. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 7/19/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dennis Shawn Roberts (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 7/19/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. Magistrate Judge designation: Colin H. Lindsay. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 7/19/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Monticello, KY, Tim Koger, David Morvac, Bruse Piercy, Harvey Shearer, filed by Dennis Shawn Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons) (DJT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2018: #3 Attachment to Complaint) (DJT). [Transferred from kywd on 7/19/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Morvac et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Shawn Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruse Piercy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Morvac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Koger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Monticello, KY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?