Foster v. Medical Division
Plaintiff: Bradley L. Foster
Defendant: Medical Division
Case Number: 6:2018cv00205
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Foster's motions to proceed in forma pauperis [R. #9 , #12 ] are DENIED AS MOOT., Motions terminated: #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley L. Foster filed by Bradley L. Foster, #12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley L. Foster filed by Bradley L. Foster. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/16/2018.(RBB)cc: COR, paper copy to Bradley L. Foster, via US Mail.
August 16, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley L. Foster, #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley L. Foster (JMB)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley L. Foster, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - front and back; postmarked 8/9/2018)(JMB)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Bradley Foster, pro se (Attachments: #1 Envelope - front and back; postmarked 8/9/2018) (JMB)
August 11, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS by Bradley L. Foster re #1 Complaint (JMB) (NOTE: Document received from Clerk-WDKY)
August 11, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley L. Foster, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - front and back; postmarked 8/8/2018)(JMB)(NOTE: Documents received from Clerk-WDKY)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: 1. Fosters Complaint [R. 1] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. Fosters motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [R. 3] is DENIED AS MOOT. 3. This matter is STRICKEN from the Courts docket.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/7/2018.(JMB)cc: COR, Bradley Foster via US Mail
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MRS)
August 1, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (TDA)
August 1, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00500. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Foster w/ copy of docket sheet via US Mail
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/31/2018. The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Southern Division at London, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 8/1/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bradley L. Foster (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 8/1/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Lanny King. (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 8/1/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical Division, filed by Bradley L. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Complaint, #2 Summons) (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 8/1/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Medical Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley L. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?