Lightbourn v. Warden, USP McCreary
Petitioner: Donaveon Lightbourn
Respondent: Warden, USP McCreary
Case Number: 6:2018cv00208
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: McCreary
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: 1) Lighthourn's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [R. 11] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) The Clerk of the Court SHALL send Lightbourn a Sixth Circuit Form 4 and a Certificate of Inmate Account form [E.D. Ky 523 form]; 3) Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Lighthourn must either pay t he $505.00 appellate filing fee to the Clerk of this Court or complete the following steps in order to properly pursue pauper status: a. complete the Sixth Circuit Form 4; b. have prison staff complete and sign the Certificate of Inmate Account form; and c. file both documents with this Court. If Lightbourn fails to take these steps within the time allowed, his appeal may be dismissed; 4) The Clerk of the Court SHALL forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/28/2018.(RC)cc: COR, Clerk 6CCA, paper copy to pro se Petitioner with Sixth Circuit Form 4 and Certificate of Inmate Account form [E.D. Ky. 523 form]
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 18-6024 Case Manager Jill Colyer for #10 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donaveon Lightbourn. (RC)
September 21, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #10 Notice of Appeal,, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donaveon Lightbourn (PRO SE) (RC)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donaveon Lightbourn (PRO SE)Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Sworn Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Copy of mailing env_front&back_postmarked 9.9.18)(RC)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Judgment #6 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by Donaveon Lightbourn (PRO SE) cc: COR, 6CCA, paper copy to pro se petitioner with copy of NOA, Memorandum Opinion and Order, Judgment, docket sheet (Attachments: #1 copy of mailing env_front&back_postmarked 9/9/18)(RC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #2 certificate of service) (RC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #3 CORRECT Notice of Appeal) (RC).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that Lightbourn's Motion to Reconsider [R. #8 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/10/2018.(RBB)cc: COR, paper copy to Donaveon Lightbourn via US Mail.
September 4, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Pro Se for review: re #8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Judgment #6 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by Donaveon Lightbourn (RBB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Judgment,, #6 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by Donaveon Lightbourn, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State of Florida Information (Numbered 1 - 8 w/ page 4 being omitted), #2 Exhibit B - Part B of The Defendant's Criminal History, #3 Mailing Envelope postmarked 8/30/2018)(RBB)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 JUDGMENT in favor of Warden, USP McCreary against Donaveon Lightbourn: 1. Donaveon Lightbourn's petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 [R. #1 ] is DENIED. Judgment is entered in favor of the Respondent with respect to all issues raised in this proceeding. 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/16/2018.(RBB)cc: COR, Donaveon Lightbourn via US Mail.
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Lightbourn's petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 [R. #1 ] is DENIED. 2. The currently pending Motion for Order for Respondent to Show Cause [R. #3 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. 3. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 4. A corresponding Judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/16/2018.(RBB)cc: COR,paper copy to Donaveon Lightbourn, via US Mail.
August 9, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #5 Filing Fee Received (KJA)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Filing fee received - $ 5, receipt number 6007179 (KJA)
August 6, 2018 Clerk's Note re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Clerk's office has been informed that the filing fee will be paid and has been mailed on this date. (SYD)
August 2, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Donaveon Lightbourn (RC)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (RC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2018: #1 Main Document) (RC).
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Order for Respondent to Show Cause Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 by Donaveon Lightbourn (pro se)Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 copy of mailing env_front&back_postmarked 7.31.18)(RC)
August 2, 2018 Conflict Check run. (RC)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Donaveon Lightbourn (pro se) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #3 Affidavit Donaveon Lightbourn, #4 Copy of mailing env_front&back_postmarked 7.31.18)(RC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightbourn v. Warden, USP McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, USP McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donaveon Lightbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?