Wood v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Lawrence Wood
Defendant: M.D. Edward Perkins, Della Thomas, Angel Wilson, Mary Willard and Crystal Scott
Case Number: 6:2018cv00210
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1) Wood's pending motion to proceed IFP is DENIED; 2) Wood must pay the $50.00 adm fee to the Court w/in 14 days, or his case will be dismissed w/out prejudice for failure to prosecute. Wood is advised that the Court received his payment of $350.00 for the filing fee. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/25/18.(MRS)cc: COR, Pro Se filer, Finance
September 24, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #9 Filing Fee Received (KJA)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 Filing Fee Filing fee received - $ 350.00, receipt number 6007248 (KJA)
September 20, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Lawrence Wood (KJA)
September 20, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #6 Letter (KJA)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Samuel Lawrence Wood, pro se. ***Mailing envelope attached at DE #6. (KJA)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Lawrence Wood, pro se. ***Mailing envelope attached at DE #6. (KJA)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Samuel Wood, pro se, addressed to the Clerk of Court concerning payment. (Attachments: #1 BP Form 199, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmark unknown) (KJA)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Clerk mark assigned forms w/ case number and send to plaintiff; 2. filing fee required; 3. pla on notice that failure to submit forms or pay fee w/in 30 days or his case will be dismissed w/out prejudice.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/5/18. (Attachments: #1 AO-240 Form, #2 EDKY 523 Form)(MRS)cc: COR, pro se filer
August 6, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (no filing fee), #2 Case Transferred Out - Other District Transfer (MRS)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page) (MRS)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern. Case number 5:18-cv-12298. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Pro Se Filer w/copy of docket sheet
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Eastern District of Kentucky. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll) [Transferred from mied on 8/6/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Samuel Lawrence Wood against Edward Perkins, Crystal Scott, Della Thomas, Mary Willard, Angel Wilson (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll) [Transferred from mied on 8/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Lawrence Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Edward Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Della Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?