Smith v. Sentinel Echo et al

Plaintiff: Joshua R. Smith and Joshua Smith
Defendant: Lexington Herald Leader, WKYT.18 News, Nita Johnson, Dennis House, Karla Ward, WYMT News and Sentinel Echo
Case Number: 6:2018cv00218
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: Laurel
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of the Court's August 20, 2018 Order of Dismissal [R. #6 ] and attached forms [Rs. #6 -1, #6 -2, and #6 -3] to Smith at 8872 W. Laurel Road in London, Kentucky 40741. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/10/2018.(RBB)cc: COR, paper copy to Joshua Smith w/ DE 6 and attachments 1, 2 & 3 to DE #6 to the address: 8872 W. Laurel Road, London, KY 40741, via US Mail.
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joshua Smith re #6 Order, Terminated Case. (KJA)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Joshua R. Smith, pro se stating that he will be moved to new housing. Requesting that all mail be sent to him at: Joshua R. Smith, 8872 W. Laurel Road, London, KY 40741. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope, front & back, postmarked 8/16/2018) (RBB)Note: DE #6 Order of Dismissal w/ attachments forwarded to address listed in this docket entry on this date.
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. Joshua Smith's complaint [R. #1 ] is DISMISSED without prejudice. 2. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. 3. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 4. The Clerk of the Court shall send Smith a Civil Rights Complaint form [E.D. Ky. 520 Form], as well as an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [AO 240 Form] and a Certificate of Inmate Account form [E.D. Ky. 523 Form]. 5. If Smith wishes to file a new action regarding this matter, he may do so by completing and filing the forms in accordance with the instructions set forth above. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 E.D. Ky. 520 Form, #2 AO 240 Form, #3 E.D. Ky. 523 Form)(RBB)cc: COR, paper copy to Joshua Smith, via US Mail.
August 14, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua R. Smith, pro se. (KJA)
August 14, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (KJA)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua R. Smith, pro se. ***Mailing envelope attached at D.E. #1. (KJA)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua R. Smith, pro se. ***Mailing envelope attached at D.E. #1. Motions referred to P SO. (KJA)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Joshua R. Smith, pro se. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 08/11/2018)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Sentinel Echo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Herald Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WKYT.18 News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYMT News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Echo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?