Doe(s) v. McCreary County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: John and Jane Doe(s)
Defendant: Michael M. Cash, Todd Waters and McCreary County Board of Education
Case Number: 6:2018cv00219
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: McCreary
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101et
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John and Jane Doe(s) via personal delivery by deputy sheriff to Michael M. Cash served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018; Michael M. Cash served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018; McCreary County Board of Education served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018; Todd Waters served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018; Todd Waters served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Miller, Christopher)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Michael M. Cash, McCreary County Board of Education, Todd Waters. Summons re-issued and returned to counsel electronically. (RBB)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: (1) Defendants' motions to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) [DE #5 ; #6 ; #7 ] are DENIED. (2) Plaintif's motion to reissue summonses within the time period allotted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) [DE #8 ] is GRANTED and the Clerk shall reissue and electronically return the tendered summonses. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/25/2018.(RBB)cc: COR
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by John and Jane Doe(s) to Re-issue Summonses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Affidavit of Emily Simpson, #2 Exhibit B--Summonses for Defendants, #3 Proposed Order)(Miller, Christopher)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Tia Combs re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael M. Cash, #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Todd Waters, and #7 MOTION to Dismiss by McCreary County Board of Education; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (RBB)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by McCreary County Board of Education Special and Limited Appearance by the Board of Education of McCreary County, Kentucky for the Purpose of Filing This Motion to Dismiss for Improper Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Mailing Envelope, #2 Proposed Order)(Combs, Tia) Modified on 9/13/2018 (RBB).
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael M. Cash, Special and Limited Appearance by Michael Cash, in his Individual and Official Capacity for the Purpose of His Motion to Dismiss for Improper Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Envelope, #2 Proposed Order)(Combs, Tia) Modified on 9/13/2018 (RBB).
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Todd Waters, Todd Waters Special and Limited Appearance by Todd Waters in his Individual and Official Capacity, for the Purpose of his Motion to Dismiss for Improper Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Mailing Envelope, #2 Proposed Order)(Combs, Tia) Modified on 9/13/2018 (RBB).
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John and Jane Doe(s) via Certfied mail to Michael M. Cash served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; Michael M. Cash served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; McCreary County Board of Education served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; Todd Waters served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018; Todd Waters served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Miller, Christopher)
August 14, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael M. Cash, Michael M. Cash, McCreary County Board of Education, Todd Waters, Todd Waters; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KJA)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4144580), filed by John and Jane Doe(s). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Board of Education of McCreary County, #3 Proposed Summons as to Michael M. Cash, #4 Proposed Summons as to Todd Waters)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe(s) v. McCreary County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M. Cash
Represented By: Tia Jenay Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Waters
Represented By: Tia Jenay Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCreary County Board of Education
Represented By: Tia Jenay Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Jane Doe(s)
Represented By: Edward E. Dove
Represented By: Christopher D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?