Moose v. Barnhart
Petitioner: Thirplus Moose
Respondent: J. A. Barnhart
Case Number: 6:2018cv00232
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 USCA Case Number 18-6051 Case Manager Jill Colyer for #12 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thirplus Moose. (SYD)
October 4, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #12 Notice of Appeal, (KJA)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Judgment, #8 Memorandum Opinion & Order by Thirplus Moose, pro se. cc: COR, 6CCA. Short record mailed to pro se filer (notice of appeal, Opinion and Order, and docket sheet.) (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 10/02/2018)(KJA)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court DENIES DE #10 . Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 08/24/2018.(KJA)cc: COR, mailed paper copy to pro se filer
September 24, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PRO SE for review: re #10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Judgment, #8 Memorandum Opinion & Order by Thirplus Moose (SYD)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Judgment, #8 Memorandum Opinion & Order by Thirplus Moose. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Facts in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 9/21/18)(SYD)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT : (1) The Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Respondent; (2) The Court enters JUDGMENT against Petitioner; (3) The Court DISMISSES Moose's 2241 petition with prejudice; (4) This is a final Judgment as to the rights and liabilities of all claims and parties; and (5) The Court STRIKES this matter from the active docket. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/13/18.(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION & ORDER : the Court DISMISSES Moose's 2241 petition (DE #1 ) and will enter a separate Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/13/18.(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer
September 11, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PRO SE for review: #7 Order Reopening Case, Terminate Motions (SYD)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : the Court GRANTS DE #5 , Motion for reconsideration, and reopens this case, redocketing the petition. Moose's petition stands ripe for screening. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/11/18.(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer
September 10, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #6 Filing Fee Received (KJA)
September 10, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order Dismissing Case by Thirplus Moose (KJA)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Filing fee received - $ 5, receipt number 6007225 (KJA)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order Dismissing Case by Thirplus Moose, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 09/07/2018)(KJA)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : the Court DENIES DE #1 WITHOUT PREJUDICE and STRIKESthis matter from the active docket. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/4/18. (Attachments: #1 AO 240, #2 EDKy 523)(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer w/forms
August 31, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
August 31, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (KJA)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Thirplus Moose, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thirplus Moose, #2 Exhibits, #3 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 08/30/2018)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moose v. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. A. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thirplus Moose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?