Davis v. Federal Correctional Officer Perry

Plaintiff: Jaquan Davis
Defendant: Federal Correctional Officer Perry
Case Number: 6:2018cv00255
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ew #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: 1.Davis motion to proceed in forma pauperis [R. 5] is GRANTED. 2.Because Davis has been granted pauper status in this proceeding, the $50.00administrative fee is waived. District Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, 14. Title 28, Section 1915(b)(1), (2) require a prisoner to pay the $350.00 filing fee as set forth below. 3.The financial documentation filed by Davis indicates that he lacks sufficientincome or assets to pay the initial partial filing fee required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), and payment of such fee is therefore DEFERRED. 4. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Davis name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525) and shall sendthe Notice and a copy of this Order to the warden of the institution in which Davis is confined. 5. Each month, if the amount in Davis inmate account exceeds $10.00, his custodian shall deduct from Davis inmate account an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month and remit that sum to the Clerk of the Court. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915 (b)(2). 6. Davis must immediately advise the Clerks Office of any change in his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 7. This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A.. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/13/2018. (JMB)cc: COR, Finance, Jaquan Davis via US Mail, Warden w/ Ntc of Payment Form
November 13, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (KJA)
November 13, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jaquan Davis (KJA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jaquan Davis, pro se. **Mailing envelope attached at DE #5 . (KJA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jaquan Davis, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 11/5/2018)(KJA)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER: 1. Clerk mark assigned forms w/ case number and send to plaintiff; 2. filing fee required; 3. pla on notice that failure to submit forms or pay fee w/in 21 days the court will dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/16/18. (Attachments: #1 EDKY 523 Form, #2 AO -240 Form)(MRS)cc: COR, Pro Se filer w/forms
October 12, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (RC)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(RC)
October 12, 2018 Conflict Check run. (RC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Judge P SO., filed by Jaquan Davis (pro se) (Attachments: #1 Various attachments, #2 copy of mailing env_front&back_no postmark)(RC) Modified on 10/12/2018 (RC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Federal Correctional Officer Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Correctional Officer Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaquan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?