Lee's Ford Dock, Inc. v. M/V Magic Moments, U.S.C.G.
Plaintiff: Lee's Ford Dock, Inc.
Defendant: M/V Magic Moments, U.S.C.G.
Case Number: 6:2018cv00288
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by M/V Magic Moments, U.S.C.G. filed by Lee's Ford Dock, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dennis Burns Slip Agreement, #2 Exhibit Dennis Burns Deposition)(Thompson, Joseph)
December 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by M/V Magic Moments, U.S.C.G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A docket sheet pulaski circuit court, #2 Proposed Order proposed order of dismissal)(Davis, Rodney)
December 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by M/V Magic Moments, U.S.C.G.. (Davis, Rodney)
November 9, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Lee's Ford Dock, Inc. MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Lee's Ford Dock, Inc. (RBB)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lee's Ford Dock, Inc.. (Thompson, Joseph)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Joseph D. Thompson. #1 Complaint has been filed by Lee's Ford Dock, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KJA)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Lee's Ford Dock, Inc. , MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Lee's Ford Dock, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application for Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Vessel Arrest, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Substitute Custodian, #4 Exhibit Proposed Notice of Vessel Arrest, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Hamilton, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney Thompson)(Thompson, Joseph)
November 8, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN ADMIRALITY (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4211372), filed by Lee's Ford Dock, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Verification of J.D. Hamilton)(KJA) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (KJA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee's Ford Dock, Inc. v. M/V Magic Moments, U.S.C.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee's Ford Dock, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Magic Moments, U.S.C.G.
Represented By: Rodney Garrett Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?