Taylor v. Bennet

Plaintiff: Tracey Dewayne Taylor
Defendant: Kim Bennet
Case Number: 6:2018cv00309
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Tracey Dewayne Taylor re #9 Order Dismissing Case. (RBB)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. Taylor's complaint [R. #1 ] is DISMISSED without prejudice because he has not kept the Court apprised of his most recent address. 2. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. Taylor may file a new complaint regarding this matter. However, if Taylor does file such a complaint, he must also either pay the $400.00 in filing and administrative fees, or he must properly move for leave to proceed in forma pauperis before this Court. Finally, Taylor must also inform the Court of his current mailing address. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 01/03/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, mailed to pro se filer via US Mail
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mailings to pro se party, Tracey Taylor addressed to Harlan County Detention Center, returned, re: #4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00798. re #6 Pro Se Information Packet, and #7 Order. (RBB)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Clerk send Taylor forms. 2. W/in 30 days from entry Taylor must either pay $400 or ask to pay the fee in installments by completing forms. 3. If Taylor fails to take steps w/in time, Court will dismiss case for failure to prosecute. 4. Taylor must also keep Clerk informed of mailing address. If Taylor fails to do so, Court may dismiss his case. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/07/2018. (Attachments: #1 Form AO 240, #2 Form EDKy 523)(KJA)cc: COR, pro se filer via US Mail
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
December 6, 2018 Conflict Check run. (MRS)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00798. file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: pro se filer
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/4/2018: The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Southern Division at London, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. cc: Plaintiff (pro se) (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 12/6/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kim Bennet, filed by Tracey Dewayne Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Bennet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Bennet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Dewayne Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?