Gorman v. Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Daniel Gorman
Defendant: Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company, John Doe and Hazard Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv00319
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand by Lawrence Daniel Gorman filed by Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McGuffin, Robin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Lawrence Daniel Gorman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hazard Insurance Webpage - Products & Services, #2 Exhibit B - Hazard Ins Agency Inc - Secretary of State Info, #3 Exhibit C - Hazard Ins. Grp - Secretary of State Info, #4 Exhibit D - Hazard Insurance Webpage - Our Mission, #5 Exhibit E - Hazard Insurance Webpage - Independent Agents, #6 Proposed Order Order)(Watkins, J.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company.(Hixson, Marshall)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE: All parties and counsel are hereby notified that the undersigned'S stepson, Lloyd R. Cress, Jr., is employed as a non-equity member of Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/17/2018.(RBB)cc: COR
December 14, 2018 Conflict Check run. (RBB)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity & Guaranty Life Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent FGL US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent CF Bermuda Holdings Limited for Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company. (RBB)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Perry Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-476, (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4240572), filed by Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-Hazard Insurance Agency Articles of Dissolution, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Service of Process, #4 Exhibit D-Articles of Incorporation and 2018 Biennial Report, #5 Exhibit E-Policy Owner Annual Report, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(RBB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorman v. Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Represented By: T. Morgan Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Robin E. McGuffin
Represented By: Marshall R. Hixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazard Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Daniel Gorman
Represented By: J. Tanner Watkins
Represented By: R. Brooks Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?