Prewitt v. Prewitt et al

Plaintiff: Michael F. Prewitt
Defendant: Jackie Steele, Gregory Lay, Leann Pennington, John and/or Jane Does, Sharon Prewitt, Amanda Hill, Greg Helton, Brandon L. Cartwright, John W. Dixon, Joseph Baron Hammons, Kay Smith Schwartz, Knox County, Whitley County and Danny Prewitt
Case Number: 6:2018cv00329
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date, and pursuant toRule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows: 1. Michael Prewitt's claims [R. #1 ] are DISMISSED. 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 01/03/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, mailed to pro se filer via US Mail
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Prewitt's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [R. #3 ] is GRANTED, and payment of the filing and administrative fees in this case is WAIVED. 2. Prewitt's claims [R. #1 ] are DISMISSED, and this action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. All other pending motions are DENIED as moot. 4. A corresponding Judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 01/03/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, mailed to pro se filer via US Mail
December 27, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
December 27, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael J. Prewitt, #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael J. Prewitt (KJA)
December 27, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (KJA)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. (KJA)cc: COR Modified to state copy of General Order mailed to pro se filer via US mail on 12/27/2018 (KJA).
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael F. Prewitt, pro se. ***Mailing envelope attached at DE #1.Motions referred to P SO. (KJA) Modified text on 12/27/2018 (KJA).
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael F. Prewitt, pro se. ***Mailing envelope attached at DE #1. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2018: #2 Financial Statement) (KJA).
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by Michael F. Prewitt, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 12/21/2018)(KJA) Modified text on 12/27/2018 (KJA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prewitt v. Prewitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Prewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon L. Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Baron Hammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Smith Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitley County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Prewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F. Prewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?