Commonwealth of Kentucky, Transportation Cabinet, Department of Highways v. Roberts et al

Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky, Transportation Cabinet, Department of Highways
Defendant: Leslie County, Kentucky, Bernice Roberts and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 6:2019cv00005
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO KEVIN ROBINSON, SAMANTHA TUCKER NANCE AND SETH B. PINSON: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #5 Order For Meeting and Report. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, KEVIN ROBINSON, SAMANTHA TUCKER NANCE AND SETH B. PINSON by US Mail with ECF Registration Form (JMB)
February 13, 2019 Clerk's Note: re #5 Order For Meeting and Report: Copies mailed to attorneys Kevin Robinson, Samantha Tucker Nance, and Seth B. Pinson. (KJA)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days, parties shall meet to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2. Within 14 days of meeting, file joint status report. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 02/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 MJ Consent Form)(KJA)cc: COR
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 **DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR** NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Seth B. Pinson by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(JMB) Modified on 2/20/2019 (JMB).
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 **DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR** NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Kevin Robinson by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(JMB) Modified on 2/20/2019 (JMB).
January 4, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JMB)
January 4, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bernice Roberts. (Filed as an attachment to the Notice of Removal #1 as part of Exhibit A - State Court Record)(JMB)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Leslie Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00166., filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(JMB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commonwealth of Kentucky, Transportation Cabinet, Department of Highways v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice Roberts
Represented By: William V. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Thomas Lee Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky, Transportation Cabinet, Department of Highways
Represented By: Darren L. Embry
Represented By: Samantha Tucker Nance
Represented By: James G. Womack
Represented By: Seth B. Pinson
Represented By: Kevin Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?