Collins v. Doe

Plaintiff: Freddie Collins
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 6:2019cv00009
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: Claria Horn Boom
1 Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Fredfie Collins re #4 Order. (RBB)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1. The Clerk of the Court shall send Collins the following forms: a. a Court-approved civil rights complaint form [E.D. Ky. 520 Form]; b. an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [A.O. 240 Form]; and c. a Certificate of Inmate Account Form [E.D. Ky. 523 Form]. 2. Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Collins must complete the Court-approved civil rights complaint form [E.D. Ky. 520 Form] in its entirety and file it with the Court. 3. Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Collins must also either pay the $400.00 in filing and administrative fees up front and in full, or he must ask to pay the filing fee in installments over time by completing and filing both the A.O. 240 Form and the E.D. Ky. 523 Form. 4. If Collins fails to take the foregoing steps within the time allotted, the Court will dismiss his case for failure to prosecute. 5. Finally, Collins must also keep the Clerk of the Court informed of his current mailing address. If Collins fails to notify the Clerk of any change in his address, the Court will dismiss his case. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 520 Form, #2 AO 240 Form, #3 EDKy 523 Form)(RBB)cc: COR, paper copy w/ forms mailed to Freddie Collins.
January 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint. (SCD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(SCD)
January 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SCD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Freddie Collins (Pro Se). (Attachments: #1 Envelope (Postmark Jan 9, 2019))(SCD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?