Gibson v. Armstrong World Industries

Plaintiff: Gary Doug Gibson
Defendant: Armstrong World Industries
Case Number: 6:2019cv00037
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNREDACTED ORDER re #10 Order cc: service electronically to ECF COR. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE DIRECTED TO LOG-IN TO CM/ECF TO VIEW THE DOCUMENT.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/1/19.(SYD)cc: COR
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (redacted): A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 6/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. To join the teleconference, the parties are DIRECTED to call as detailed in the unredacted Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/1/19.(SYD)cc: COR
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) the following ddlns shall be observed: a) Initial disclosures by 4/18/19. These need not be filed in the Court record; b) Discovery as stated. i. Fact Discovery by 10/1/19; ii. Expert discovery nlt 1/3/20; c) Supplementation as stated. Supplemental disclosures & responses need not be filed in the Court record; d) Motions to join addl parties or amend pleadings by 8/2/19; e) Expert witnesses (i) from pla nlt 10/31/19; and (ii) dft nlt 12/2/19; f) Dispositive motions 3/6/20, w/response & reply time per Rule; 2. Parties to observe FRCivP 5(d) directives; 3. FPTC before the undersigned on 7/28/20 at 10:00 a.m. at London. 4. NLT 21 days prior to ptc, counsel shall file the filing: a. wit & exh list; b. motions in limine; c. evid depos to be used at trial; d. pt memo; e. proposed agreed jury instructions; 5. NLT 14 days before ptc: a. written objs; b. responses to motion in limine; c. responses to motion for ruling on obj. 6. At ptc, counsel shall be prepared to: a. make possible stipulations of admissibility; b. disclose demo or summary exhs; c. display all exhs to be used at trial; d. discuss possibility of settlement; e. advise Court of anticipated tech issues; 7. NLT 7 working days prior to trial counsel shall submit to Chambers a copy of each doc exh. 8. TRIAL BY JURY on 8/25/20 at 9:30 a.m. at London. Counsel present by 9:00 a.m. Anticipated length 3 days. 9. Referred to MJ Hanly A. Ingram to: a. resolve all non-dispositive motions; b. manage discovery; c. manage pt sched issues; d. 2. Conduct mid-discovery telephonic conference; e. conduct settlement conference. 10. Discovery disputes as stated. 11. Modification of this schedule is unlikely & will occur only for good cause. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 03/29/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, London Diary, Jury Clerk
March 27, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #8 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KJA)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Coleman, Katherine)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days, parties shall meet to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2. Within 14 days of meeting, file joint status report. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 03/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(KJA)cc: COR
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Armstrong World Industries.(Coleman, Katherine)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [R. #4 ] is GRANTED. 2. Defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc. shall have up to and including March 1, 2019, in which to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 02/13/2019.(KJA)cc: COR
February 12, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Armstrong World Industries (RBB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Armstrong World Industries (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Katherine)
February 6, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Armstrong World Industries. (SYD)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pulaski Circuit Court, case number No. 18-CI-1308 filed by Armstrong World Industries. Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4278887. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Record, #3 3-Cited Pages from KY Trial Court Review, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Armstrong World Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Doug Gibson
Represented By: Edward E. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong World Industries
Represented By: Donald C. Morgan
Represented By: Katherine M. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?