Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Anda, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Ace Clinique of Medicine, LLC., Cardinal Health, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Richie Pharmacal Co., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., The Recovery Center, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SPECGX, Does 1-100, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Depomed, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00038
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Clerk's Note: Case transferred from Eastern District of Kentucky has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45082, filed 02/25/2019. (RBB)
February 23, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc.. Amendment to File Submitted . (Burke, Jessica) Modified on 2/25/2019 (RBB). Note: Document electronically forwarded to NDOH for inclusion in transferred case 1:19-op-45082.
February 21, 2019 Clerk's Note: JPMDL information re #13 Case Transferred to MDL extracted and electronically transmitted to AO. (SKV)
February 21, 2019 Clerk's Note: re #13 Case Transferred to MDL: Civil case extracted and electronically transferred to the ND of Ohio. (MRS)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-80) received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 80 filed in MDL Case Number 2804 (MRS) cc: COR
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (CTO-80) (MRS)
February 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation enlarging time by Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc. (RBB)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation enlarging time by Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc.. (Burke, Jessica)
February 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by H.D. Smith, LLC (RBB) Modified on 2/15/2019 (RBB).
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Simpson, W.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Simpson, W.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Supplement to State Court Record Evidencing Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order for Extension of Time)(Loy, Steven)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richie Pharmacal Co.. (Cook, Matthew)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Richie Pharmacal Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting)(Cook, Matthew)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis Pharma, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Pharma, Inc... (Spurlock, M.)
February 7, 2019 Clerk's Note: re #1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel (cc: SKV) notified of possible tag along case (MDL No. 2804) by e-mail with a copy of notice of removal & docket sheet. (KJA)
February 7, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER 17-16 RE: CIVIL CASES RELATED TO COMPLAINTS FILED AGAINST AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., and MCKESSON CORPORATION: 1. Effective immediately, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/22/2017.(KJA)cc: COR
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Perry Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00512. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4279096), filed by Actavis Pharma, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 3 - JPML Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mayfield v. London Womens Care, #5 Exhibit 5 - McDowell v. McKesson, #6 Exhibit - Huntington v. AmerisourceBergen, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2019: #8 Agreed Order For Extention of Time to File Answer (State Court Order)) (RBB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Thomas McIntosh
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: C. Scott Jones
Represented By: Lauren M. Fincher
Represented By: Brandan J. Montminy
Represented By: Robert Coleman Stilz, III
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Represented By: Christopher M. Mussler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Ana Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Clinique of Medicine, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richie Pharmacal Co.
Represented By: Matthew Porter Cook
Represented By: Colton William Givens
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Represented By: Anne K. Guillory
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Recovery Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Shannon E. McClure
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Represented By: Jenny A. Hergenrother
Represented By: Cari K. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Powers
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ann Burke
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Ronald Eric Mills
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: David Black
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Monica Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?