Blue Rose Spirits, LLC v. Om Raja Ram, Inc.
Plaintiff: Blue Rose Spirits, LLC
Defendant: Om Raja Ram, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00044
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blue Rose Spirits, LLC via Certified Mail to Om Raja Ram, Inc. served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Gray, Elisabeth)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Om Raja Ram, Inc.(Amended Complaint); Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SYD)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Jury Demand against Om Raja Ram, Inc., filed by Blue Rose Spirits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit 1 - KY SOS Certificate re Liquor Barn, #3 Exhibit 2 - KY SOS Certificate re Liquor Barn Express, #4 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Assumed Name, #5 Exhibit 4 - Commonwealth Journal July 2017 Article, #6 Exhibit 5 - Case and Desist Letter, #7 Summons)(Gray, Elisabeth)
February 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: #1 Complaint, (SYD)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register. (SYD)
February 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Rose Spirits, LLC. (SYD)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Blue Rose Spirits, LLC.( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4284214) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-KY SOS Certificate re Liquor Barn, #2 Exhibit 2-KY SOS Certificate re Liquor Barn Express, #3 Exhibit 3-Certificate of Assumed Name, #4 Exhibit 4-Commonwealth Journal July 2017 Article, #5 Exhibit 5-Cease and Desist Letter, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Rose Spirits, LLC v. Om Raja Ram, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Om Raja Ram, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Rose Spirits, LLC
Represented By: Dennis D. Murrell
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?