Hansel v. Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael P. Hansel
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00054
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (construed to be a Motion for Case Abeyance) : Court GRANTS DE 7 and ORDERS the parties file a status update by June 25, 2019. If appropriate, the report should also include the information set forth in DE #4 2. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 4/16/19.(SYD)cc: COR
March 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (SYD)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for case abeyance (See DE #8 ) #JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order)(Johnson, Lira) ADDED text on 4/16/2019 (SYD).
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company.(Johnson, Lira)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Lira)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. W/I 21 days parties meet. 2. W/I 14 days of the meeting file report: a-e. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(SYD)cc: COR Modified text on 2/19/2019 (SYD).
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Lira Johnson. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SYD)
February 19, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pulaski Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-36, filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4288376) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Summons, #3 State Court Record Complaint, #4 Everett v. American Gen. Life Ins. Co., #5 State Court Record Notice of Removal)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansel v. Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Hansel
Represented By: Richard Hay
Represented By: Sarah Hay Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Lira A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?