Craig v. Kizziah et al

Plaintiff: Cornelius Kenyatta Craig
Defendant: Mr. Kizziah and Mr. W. Thompson
Case Number: 6:2019cv00063
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued (USM 285 Form) as to Kizziah, W. Thompson,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (SYD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #1 USM Receipt) (KJA).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION & ORDER : 1. Craigs First Amendment claims set forth on his civil rights complaint form [R. #1 ] are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. Craigs Eighth Amendment claim set forth in his supplemental complaint [R. #6 ] may PROCEED; 3. A Deputy Clerk shall prepare two Service Packets for service upon the Defendants.The Service Packets shall include: a-e. 4. Clerk send packets to USM in Lexington. 5. USMS shall personally serve Warden Kizziah and Captain Thompson at the USP. 6. Craig must advise of any change to his mailing address; and 7. Craig must file formal motion. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/1/19.(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 2. payment of an initial partial filing fee is DEFERRED. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Craig's name for receipt of Craigs future payments. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form. Clerk serve this order and Notice of Payment Form upon the warden; 4. Each month Craig's custodian send a pymt. in an amount equal to 20%. 5. Matter stands submitted for screening. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/2/19. (Attachments: #1 EDKY 525) (SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer and Warden with form; finance
April 1, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PRO SE for review: #6 Supplemental Complaint (SYD)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cornelius Kenyatta Craig,PRO SE. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 3/29/19)(SYD)
March 5, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
March 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cornelius Kenyatta Craig (KJA)
March 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred), #4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (KJA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Cornelius Kenyatta Craig, pro se. Note: Mailing envelope attached at D.E. #1 . (KJA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cornelius Kenyatta Craig, pro se. Note: Mailing envelope attached at D.E. #1 . Motions referred to P SO. (KJA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Cornelius Kenyatta Craig, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmark unknown)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Kizziah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Kenyatta Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?