Estep v. SSA

Plaintiff: Carter Dean Estep
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 6:2019cv00076
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: 1. Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; 2. Secretary file response w/in 90 days; 3. extensions may be granted only upon showing of good cause. (KJA)cc: COR
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Transcript - Social Security)(Morgan, Cheryl)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO McKinnley Morgan re #4 Notice of Change of Address : Signature on document and filer do not match; Entry by attorney; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is filed must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (SYD)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by McKinnley Morgan (Morgan, McKinnley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel (SYD)
March 18, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Carter Dean Estep. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4311766) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estep v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Dean Estep
Represented By: Wiley Gerald Vanover, Jr.
Represented By: McKinnley Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?