Warren v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Lamont L. Warren
Defendant: Dr. Gomez, John Doe, U.S. Parole Board, Ray Omond, Howard, Calvin Johnson, FNU Thompson and Mr. Booker
Case Number: 6:2019cv00078
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Lamont L. Warren re #26 Letter : In response to a request for the status of your case, a courtesy copy of the docket sheet in the above-styled case is enclosed. The docket sheet provides a timeline of the activity in your case with a list of filings in the case to date. cc: Lamont L. Warren by US Mail (KJA)
May 13, 2019 Filing 26 Letter from Lamont L. Warren, pro se, requesting status update. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 05/08/2019) (KJA)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: 1. Warren's "motion for the appointment of counsel" [R. #24 ] is DENIED. 2. Warren recently completed and filed the Court-approved E.D. Ky. 520 Complaint Form. That complaint [R. 20] now stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and 1915A. Motions terminated: #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lamont L. Warren filed by Lamont L. Warren. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.(RBB)cc: COR, paper copy to Lamont L. Warren, pro se, via US Mail.
May 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of pro se for review: re #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lamont L. Warren (SYD)
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lamont L. Warren, PRO SE. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Cover letter, #4 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 4/26/19)(SYD)
April 30, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Pro Se for review: #23 Notice OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS ON THE GROUNDS IT RESTS (RBB)
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS ON THE GROUND IT RESTS by Lamont L. Warren, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope, front & back, postmarked 4/26/2019)(RBB)
April 29, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Pro Se for review: #21 Amended Complaint, #22 Letter (RBB)
April 29, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Pro Se for review: #21 Amended Complaint (RBB)
April 26, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Lamont Warren, pro se (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Mailing Envelope, front & back, postmarked 4/23/2019) (RBB) Modified/Corrected file date on 4/29/2019 (RBB).
April 25, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Booker, John Doe, Gomez, Howard, Calvin Johnson, Ray Omond, Thompson, U.S. Parole Board, filed by Lamont L. Warren, pro se. Filed pursuant to #20 Order. (Attachments: #1 Asserted Complaint, #2 Denial of Due Process, #3 Amended Affidavit of Truth, #4 Various Exhibits, #5 Declaration of Truth, #6 Mailing Envelope, front & back, postmarked 4/22/2019)(RBB)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: 1. The Clerk of the Court shall send Warren a Court-approved civil rights complaint form, also known as the E.D. Ky. 520 Form. 2. Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Warren must fully complete the E.D. Ky. 520 Form and file it with this Court. 3. If Warren fails to complete and file the E.D. Ky. 520 Form within 30 days from the entry of this Order, the Court will dismiss his case. See Local Rule 5.2(b). 4. Since Warren has not yet completed this Court's approved civil rights complaint form, his motion for immediate release [R. #19 ] is DENIED as premature. 5. Finally, Warren must keep the Clerk of the Court informed of his current mailing address. If Warren fails to notify the Clerk of a change in his address, the Court may dismiss his case. Motions terminated: #19 MOTION for Order for immediate release by Lamont L. Warren filed by Lamont L. Warren. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/10/19. (Attachments: #1 E.D. Ky. 520 Form)(RBB)cc: COR, paper copy to Lamont L. Warren, via US Mail.
April 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Pro Se for review: re #19 MOTION for Order for immediate release by Lamont L. Warren (RBB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Order for immediate release by Lamont L. Warren, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope, front & back, postmarked 4/5/2019)(RBB) Modified motion text on 4/8/2019 (RBB).
March 19, 2019 Filing 18 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MRS)
March 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review (CBD)
March 19, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Western. Case number 1:18-cv-01503. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Pla w/ copy of docket sheet by US Mail
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/18/2019. (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lamont L Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 "AFFIDAVIT OF TRUTH" by Lamont L Warren. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER dated 1/14/19 from Lamont Warren to Court submitting exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $7.41. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/19/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts officer page filed by Lamont L Warren regarding #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER from Plaintiff to Court regarding issues with obtaining accounts officer page. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lamont L Warren. (No accounts officer page. Clerk resent with a note stating it must be completed.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) Modified to clear deficiency notation on 12/18/2018 (Haik, K). [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Howard, Calvin Johnson, Gomez, Thompson, Booker, John Doe, U S Parole Board, Ray Omond filed by Lamont L Warren. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 1983 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/19/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Complaint/Petition by Lamont L Warren. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
November 15, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Howard, Calvin Johnson filed by Lamont L Warren. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) . Complaint not on approved forms. [Transferred from lawd on 3/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Omond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?