Wright v. Cunnagin et al
Plaintiff: Paul Wright
Defendant: R. Jones, USP-McCreary Medical Staff, USP-McCreary, Dr. C. Cunnagin and Dr. Carrie Cunnagin
Case Number: 6:2019cv00094
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Paul Wright re #13 Notice : In response to your inquiry regarding the balance of your filing fee, the balance due is $355.33. Your payment of $14.67 was received on 5/20/19. These payments are not put on the docket sheet. A case inquiry report is enclosed. cc: Paul Wright by US Mail (SYD)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Paul Wright re #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: status of fee payment. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 5/31/19)(SYD)
June 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PRO SE for review: re #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 Complaint (Referred) by Paul Wright (SYD)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 Complaint (Referred) by Paul Wright, PRO SE. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Attachments in Support, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, no postmark)(SYD)
May 23, 2019 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Paul Wright re #11 Notice : In response to a request for the status of your case, a courtesy copy of the docket sheet in the above-styled case is enclosed. The docket sheet provides a timeline of the activity in your case with a list of filings in the case to date. cc: Paul Wright by US Mail (SYD)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Paul Wright, PRO SE, inquiring about filing in his case. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 5/20/19)(SYD)
May 6, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of pro se for review: re #10 MOTION for injunctive relief by Paul Wright (SYD)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for injunctive relif by Paul Wright, PRO SE. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Attachments in Support, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 5/1/19)(SYD)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Wright's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [R. #7 ] is GRANTED. 2. Within twenty-eight (28) days, Wright must pay $14.67 to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Wright's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525). The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form upon the Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Wright is currently confined. 4. Each month Wright's custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in an amount equal to 20% of his income. 5. Wright's motion requesting service of complaint [R. #6 ] is DENIED. 6. Wright must immediately advise the Clerks Office of any change in his current mailing address. 7. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/19. (Attachments: #1 525 Form) (SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer; warden
May 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of pro se for review: re #6 MOTION for Service of Complaint by Paul Wright, #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Wright (SYD)
May 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of pro se for review: #5 Complaint (Referred), #8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (SYD)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Paul Wright, PRO SE. (SYD)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Wright, PRO SE. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request to Staff) Mailing envelope at DE #5 (SYD)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Complaint by Paul Wright, PRO SE. Motions referred to P SO. Mailing envelope at DE #5 .(SYD)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT, filed by Paul Wright, PRO SE. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, no postmark)(SYD)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Extension of Time : 1. Wright's motion for extension of time [R. 1] is DENIED. 2. The Clerk of the Court shall mark the assigned case number on a form Civil Rights Complaint [EDKY Form 520] and send it to Wright. The Clerk of the Court shall also send Wright (1) an Affidavit of Assets / In Forma Pauperis Application [Form AO-240] and (2) a Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523]. 3. Should Wright wish to pursue this claim, he must complete and file the complaint form, describing the facts of his case. 4. Wright must either pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff, (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application, and (3) file both of them with the Court.5. Wright must take these steps within 30 days. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Form 520, #2 Form 240, #3 Form 523)(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer w/forms
April 15, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #1 MOTION for Extension of Time to Correctly File this Complaint by Paul Wright, pro se. (KJA)
April 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Extension of Time to Correctly File this Complaint by Paul Wright, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Memorandum for Paul Wright re Legal Property, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 04/09/2019)(KJA) Modified motion text and file date on 4/15/2019 (KJA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Cunnagin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP-McCreary Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP-McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. C. Cunnagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Carrie Cunnagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?