McLain et al v. Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co. et al
Plaintiff: Vanda McLain and Jason McLain
Defendant: Donald E. Romines and Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00100
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNREDACTED ORDER re #8 Order, Set Hearings, cc: service electronically to ECF COR. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE DIRECTED TO LOG-IN TO CM/ECF TO VIEW THE DOCUMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 07/09/2019.(KJA)cc: COR
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REDACTED ORDER: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL occur on 11/8/2019 at 11:30 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. The Clerk is DIRECTED to make the electronically, and docket ONLY the redacted Order. re #7 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 07/09/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, London Diary
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) the following ddlns shall be observed: a) Initial disclosures by 7/19/19; b) Fact Discovery by 4/1/20; 2) Parties to observe FRCivP 5(d) directives; 3) Discovery disputes resolved as stated; DISPOSITIVE MTNS: a) Plas shall have to 1/30/20 to file any mtns to join addl parties or amend pleadings. b) Dfts by 2/28/20. c) Dispositive mtns, mtns in Limine, and/or Daubert mtns by 8/10/20. PRETRIAL: 1) Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/20 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT; 2) NLT 7 days prior to FPTC, pt filings due as stated; 3) NLT Friday before FPTC a) pt memo b) copy of Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions; c) agreed statement of the case; d) proposed voir dire e) mtns for ruling by the Court upon objs. 4) At FPTC parties shall be prepared to a) premark and display exhs; b) advise Court exhs have been displayed to opposing counsel; c) discuss stipulations; d) demo ability to use Court's visual presentation system; e) discuss settlement; 6) Court copies of a) witness list; b) exh list; c) proposed instructions; d) proposed voir dire questions and e) statement of the case, to be provided to Chambers, via email; JURY TRIAL set for 11/24/20 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. JT expected to last 4 days. EXTENSIONS OF TIME shall be submitted upon mtn prior to expiration of ddln; REFERRAL TO MJ: Referred to Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for the purpose of: 1. Supervising discovery and pt proceedings. 2. Conducting all pt and status conferences, establishing and extending discovery ddlns, and all other ddlns, holding such hearings as may be required, and ruling on non-dispositive mtns, except mtns in limine. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 07/03/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, London Diary, Jury Clerk
July 1, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MRS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Winchell, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING: : 1) NLT 30 days from the DOE of this order, cnsl shall conduct the meeting of parties; 2) At the time of the meeting, cnsl shall exchange disclosures; 3) NLT 10 days after meeting, cnsl shall file a written joint report outlining the discovery plan; 4) In the event this matter involves a corporation or partnership, the party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the parties joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(SYD)cc: COR, mailed to Stephanie Rivas
April 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for OFMR (MRS)
April 17, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MRS)
April 17, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co., Donald E. Romines. (Attached to NOR as part of the State Court Record at #1 -1] (MRS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co. identifying Corporate Parent DDE Holdings, Inc. for Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co... (MRS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL by Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co., Donald E. Romines (MRS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whitley Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-141. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4338188), filed by Donald E. Romines, Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MRS) (

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLain et al v. Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanda McLain
Represented By: Stephanie R. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McLain
Represented By: Stephanie R. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Romines
Represented By: Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Represented By: Jennifer Lacey Fiorella
Represented By: Daniel E. Murner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Logistics Systems Ltd. Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Represented By: Jennifer Lacey Fiorella
Represented By: Daniel E. Murner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?