Barnette v. Meier et al
Plaintiff: Ashley V. Barnette
Defendant: Adam Meier, Angel Evans, Eric T. Clark, Unknown Defendant(s), James "Gary&quot Hensley, Leigha Sproles and Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services Department for Community Based Services
Case Number: 6:2019cv00125
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ashley V. Barnette (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feltner, Christian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 RENEWED MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Eric T. Clark, Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services Department for Community Based Services, Angel Evans, James "Gary" Hensley, Adam Meier, Leigha Sproles, Unk filed by Ashley V. Barnette. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feltner, Christian)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 RENEWED MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Eric T. Clark, Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services Department for Community Based Services, Angel Evans, James "Gary" Hensley, Adam Meier, Leigha Sproles, Unknown Defendant(s) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting motion)(Irvin, D.) Modified on 6/11/2019 (RBB).
June 9, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eric T. Clark, Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services Department for Community Based Services, Angel Evans, Angel Evans, James "Gary" Hensley, James "Gary" Hensley, Adam Meier, Leigha Sproles, Leigha Sproles, Unknown Defendant(s), Unknown Defendant(s), filed by Ashley V. Barnette.(Feltner, Christian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Eric T. Clark, Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services Department for Community Based Services, Angel Evans, James "Gary" Hensley, Adam Meier, Leigha Sproles, Unknown Defendant(s) Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Eric T. Clark, Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services Department for Community Based Services, Angel Evans, James "Gary" Hensley, Adam Meier, Leigha Sproles, Unknown Defendant(s) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of motion, #2 Proposed Order granting motion, #3 Exhibit 1, copy of state claims commission complaint)(Irvin, D.)
May 23, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JMB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bell Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00134. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4365961), filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services Department for Community Based Services, Leigha Sproles, Angel Evans, James "Gary" Hensley, Angel Evans, Eric T. Clark, James "Gary" Hensley, Leigha Sproles, Adam Meier. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Removal, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Appointment of Warning Order Attorney, #4 Appointment of Warning Order Attorney)(JMB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnette v. Meier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Meier
Represented By: Carmen M. Ross
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Represented By: Carmen Marie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Evans
Represented By: Carmen M. Ross
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Represented By: Carmen Marie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric T. Clark
Represented By: Carmen M. Ross
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Represented By: Carmen Marie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James "Gary&quot Hensley
Represented By: Carmen M. Ross
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Represented By: Carmen Marie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigha Sproles
Represented By: Carmen M. Ross
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Represented By: Carmen Marie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services Department for Community Based Services
Represented By: Carmen M. Ross
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Represented By: Carmen Marie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley V. Barnette
Represented By: Kenneth A. Buckle
Represented By: Christian Matthew Feltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?