Baldwin v. Hudson et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Baldwin
Defendant: Fnu Wilson, Fnu Hudson and Fnu Whittaker
Case Number: 6:2019cv00151
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Fnu Hudson, Fnu Whittaker, Fnu Wilson, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and FBOP. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (MM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #1 USM Receipt stamped 7/16/19) (KJA).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1) The Clerk SHALL prepare "Service Packets" for the United States of America, the Federal Bureau of Prisons, Officer FNU Hudson, Officer FNU Whittaker, and Officer FNU Wilson, each consisting of (a) a completed summons form; (b) the complaint (DE 1); (c) this Order; and (d) a completed USM Form 285; 2) The Clerk SHALL send the Service Packets to USMS in Lexington, Kentucky and note the date of delivery in the docket; 3) USMS shall serve the US Atty and Atty General by certified or registered mail; 4) USMS shall serve the FBOP by sending a Service Packet by certified or registered mail to the Civil Process Clerk at the Office of the US Atty for EDKY and the Atty General by certified or registered mail; 5) USMS shall personally service Officer FNU Hudson, Officer FNU Whittaker, and Officer FNU Wilson at the United States Penitentiary - McCreary in Pine Knot, Kentucky through arrangement with the Federal Bureau of Prisons. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 7/15/19.(MRS)cc: COR, Pro Se filer; Modified text on 7/15/2019 (MRS).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1) Because Reginald Baldwin has been granted pauper status, the Court wives the $50.00 adm fee; 2) Clerk SHALL (a) Open an acct in Baldwin's name; b) Complete a Notice of Payment Form and c) send the Notice and a copy of this order to the warden of the institution where Baldwin is confined; 3) Within 28 days, Baldwin's custodian SHALL deduct $3.43 from Baldwin's inmate acct and submit to that sum to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee; 4) For each month there, if Baldwin's acct exceeds $10.00 his custodian shall deduct from Baldwin's acct an amt = to 20% of Baldwin's preceding month's income and remit that sum to the Clerk of this Court. Custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid; 5) Matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 7/15/19.(MRS)cc: COR, Pro Se filer via US Mail, Finance, Warden with EDKY 525 Form as directed via US mail. Modified text for typographical error on 7/15/2019 (MRS).
July 11, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (MRS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Reginald Baldwin, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope postmarked 7-11-19)(MRS)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. The Court DENIES DE 2 without prejudice to resubmission with the required documentation, as indicated; 2. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to send Baldwin a Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523]; 3. Within 30 days, Baldwin SHALL either (1) pay all filing fees, or (2) fully complete the Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523], have the documents properly certified by prison officials, and file the statement and a renewed motion with the Court; 4. The Court notifies Baldwin that failure to comply with this Order within 30 days will likely result in dismissal. 5. If Baldwin contends that compliance is impossible, he shall verify, explain, and document that contention. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 06/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 523 Form)(KJA)cc: COR, form and Order to pro se filer via US Mail
June 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald Baldwin (MRS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MRS)
June 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MRS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald Baldwin, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Mailing envelope located at DE #1 ). (MRS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No filing fee) referred to PSO., filed by Reginald Baldwin, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope postmark not legible)(MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fnu Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fnu Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fnu Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?