Foster et al v. USA
Plaintiff: Sara Whitaker and Amy Foster
Defendant: USA
Not Yet Classified: Michael Foster
Case Number: 6:2019cv00164
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker, Michael Foster via Certified Mail to All Defendants. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via Certified MailService to U.S. Attorney General executed via Certified Mail (Queener, Henry)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 SECOND MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the motion (DE #8 ) and permits Hon. Nancy Rankin Steer, of the law firm QUEENERLAW, to serve as pro hac vice counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 08/08/2019. (MM)cc: COR, paper copy to Nancy R. Steer w/ copy of Mandatory ECF General Order & ECF. Modified text on 8/8/2019 (MM).
August 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Henry Queener re #8 SECOND MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker : Error: attachment was insufficiently described as Exhibit. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (SYD)
August 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of ROBERT E. WIER for review: re #8 SECOND MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4432478) (SYD)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4432478) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Certificate of Good Standing (TN), #2 Proposed Order)(Queener, Henry) Named Exhibit on 8/8/2019 (SYD).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: as to #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, the Court DENIES without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 08/01/2019. (MM)cc: COR, Order mailed to Attorney Nancy R. Steer. Modified text on 8/2/2019 (MM).
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker re #5 MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4424118) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Queener, Henry)
July 31, 2019 Clerk's Note: Clerk unable to create attorney profile as to Nancy R. Steer. No address or contact information provided in #5 MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker. (SCD)
July 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #5 MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4424118) (RBB)
July 30, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Nancy R. Steer re #5 MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4424118). (RBB)
July 30, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Nancy R. Steer for Amy Foster,Nancy R. Steer for Amy Foster,Nancy R. Steer for Michael Foster,Nancy R. Steer for Sara Whitaker,Nancy R. Steer for Sara Whitaker added. (RBB)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Nancy R. Steer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Michael Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4424118) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Queener, Henry)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : the Court ORDERS that DE #1 will remain preliminarily sealed until July 19, 2019. Prior to that date, the plaintiffs may file an amended complaint using only the minors initials, at which time the Clerk will strike DE 1 from the record. Otherwise, the Clerk will unseal DE #1 in its current form. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 7/12/19.(MRS)cc: COR
July 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel (MM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4408458), filed by Amy Foster, Amy Foster, Sara Whitaker, Sara Whitaker, Michael Foster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to USA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Michael Foster
Represented By: Henry Shere Queener
Represented By: Nancy Rankin Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Whitaker
Represented By: Henry Shere Queener
Represented By: Nancy Rankin Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Foster
Represented By: Henry Shere Queener
Represented By: Nancy Rankin Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?