Corbin v. SSA
Plaintiff: Preston Gerald Corbin
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 6:2019cv00168
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN as to U.S. Attorney General: Delivered 7/25/19 via USPS (MM)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Preston Gerald Corbin via certified mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 7/22/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via certified mail on 7/22/19. (SYD)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Judge Claria Horn Boom recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert E. Wier for all further proceedings. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to file a copy of this Order in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel, or, in the case of a pro se party, to the last known address of such a party. (KJA)cc: COR (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/23/2019) (MRS).
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Preston Gerald Corbin re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Ronald)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2019: #1 USM Receipt stamped 7/18/2019) (KJA).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [R. #2 ] is GRANTED. 2. The plaintiff may proceed without the payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 07/17/2019.(KJA)cc: COR
July 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria Horn Boom for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Preston Gerald Corbin (MM)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Ronald C. Cox re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Preston Gerald Corbin attorney failed to submit a [proposed order] as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled Notice of Filing, file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (MM)
July 17, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Preston Gerald Corbin (MM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Preston Gerald Corbin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Process Receipt and Return, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons General Counsel, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office)(MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbin v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Gerald Corbin
Represented By: Ronald C. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?