Forcht v. Forcht et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Forcht
Defendant: Nancy Forcht and Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00190
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim of Nancy Forcht by Jennifer Forcht.(Reeves, Sarah)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Counterclaim,, Crossclaim, of Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC by Jennifer Forcht.(Reeves, Sarah)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE TIME re #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim filed by Nancy Forcht. Defendant Prudential may file a Response to Defendant Nancy Forcht Cross-Claims (Doc. No. #10 ), through and including October 9, 2019, and no prior extension of time to respond having been sought, and the Court having considered the application. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/3/2019.(RBB)cc: COR
October 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #16 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time To Respond by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC (MRS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time To Respond by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Order)(Pullen, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jennifer Forcht filed by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Pullen, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jennifer Forcht filed by Nancy Forcht. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohnert, Kenneth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Sever by Nancy Forcht to dismiss crossclaim for breach of contract (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohnert, Kenneth)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendants Nancy Forcht and Prudential to file a Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is hereby extended to September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/20/2019.(KJA)cc: COR
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation OF EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pullen, Andrew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Cross Claim for Relief and Interpleader, CROSSCLAIM against Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Jennifer Forcht by Nancy Forcht.(Bohnert, Kenneth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Jennifer Forcht by Nancy Forcht.(Bohnert, Kenneth)
September 6, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Kenneth A. Bohnert for Nancy Forcht added. (RBB)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nancy Forcht Consent to Removal (Bohnert, Kenneth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jennifer Forcht (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Reeves, Sarah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy Forcht; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MRS)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Jennifer Forcht (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Reeves, Sarah)
August 13, 2019 COUNTERCLAIM against Jennifer Forchtm, as Personal representative of theEstate ofTheodore B. Forcht, and CROSSCLAIM against Nancy Forcht, filed by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. Filed as part of DE #4 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC.(RBB)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Life Insurance Claim Form)(Pullen, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Party Jennifer Forcht terminated per State Amended Complaint DE #1 . (MM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc., Other Affiliate The Prudential Insurance Company of America for Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC.. (MM)
August 7, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
August 7, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nancy Forcht, Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, filed by Jennifer Forcht. Filed in State Court Record - See #1 .(MM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whitley Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-338. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4432596), filed by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended State Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Disclosure Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forcht v. Forcht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Forcht
Represented By: Kenneth A. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Pullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Forcht
Represented By: Sarah Tipton Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?