Cassidy v. Aetna Life Ins. Co.
Plaintiff: Melinda Cassidy
Defendant: Aetna Life Ins. Co.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00201
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory Van Tatenhove for review: #13 Answer to Complaint (MRS)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Ins. Co..(Wahlheim, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Aetna Life Ins. Co. (Seeking Partial Dismissal) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Wahlheim, William)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This matter is before the Court upon the Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. [R. #8 .] Aetna requests a fourteen (14) day extension. ORDERED that the Defendant's motion [R. #8 ] is GRANTED. Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company shall have up to and including Thursday, October 10, 2019, to file its responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint. Answer due 10/10/2019 Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 10/7/2019.(RBB)cc: COR
September 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory Van Tatenhove for review: re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Ins. Co. (MRS)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aetna Life Ins. Co. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Aetna Life Ins. Co... (Wahlheim, William)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Aetna Life Ins. Co. re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading)(Wahlheim, William)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO W. Wahlheim re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Ins. Co.: ERROR: attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry.cc: COR cc: COR (MRS)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Ins. Co. (Wahlheim, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (MRS).
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melinda Cassidy via Certified Mail Registered Agent to Aetna Life Ins. Co. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bryant, Jeremy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Ins. Co.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MRS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Melinda Cassidy re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bryant, Jeremy)
August 21, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #1 Complaint (MM)
August 21, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reassign the case by random draw to another Judge accepting cases on the London docket pursuant to the General Order governing case assignment. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 08/21/2019.(MM)cc: COR
August 20, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4443958), filed by Melinda Cassidy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassidy v. Aetna Life Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Cassidy
Represented By: Jeremy W. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Ins. Co.
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?