Thomas et al v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Nici Thomas and Joseph Thomas
Defendant: Kentucky State Police Department, Trooper Shawn Boroviak, Examiner Kim Bradley, Trooper Michael Logan Howell, Trooper Logan Gray and Trooper Steve Walker
Case Number: 6:2019cv00226
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: P SO
2 Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Kentucky State Police Department, Steve Walker MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Kentucky State Police Department, Steve Walker filed by Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Kentucky State Police Department, Steve Walker. (Arnett, Alea)
November 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Kentucky State Police Department, Steve Walker MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Kentucky State Police Department, Steve Walker (KJA)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Pursuant to paragraph 4 of Docket Entry #10 , on or before November 21, 2019, the parties SHALL file a notice in the record, or motion if appropriate, concerning the propriety of a discovery stay pending resolution of the motions to dismiss at Docket Entries #4 and #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 11/14/2019.(KJA)cc: COR
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2. Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(KJA)cc: COR
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 2. Court refers case to USMJ for purposes of: A-J. 3. Court retains dispositive. 4. Any Rule 12 motion, MJ evaluate a discovery stay. 5. Discovery disputes to be resolved as stated. Court DIRECTS Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Case referred to Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/12/2019.(KJA)cc: COR
November 2, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 , #8 Motion To Dismiss Official Capacity Claims filed by Joseph Thomas, Nici Thomas. (O'Toole, James)
November 2, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Thomas, Nici Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email regarding activity on phone, #2 Exhibit B- Bradley Report, #3 Exhibit C - Phone Manual)(O'Toole, James)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyndol Scott Miller on behalf of Kim Bradley in her individual capacity. (Miller, Lyndol) Modified on 11/1/2019 (KJA).
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Steve Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit redacted, certified Search Warrant & Affidavit for cell phone, #2 Proposed Order granting individual capacity KSP Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Arnett, Alea)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Thomas, Nici Thomas via personal service on individual designated by law to accept service to Kim Bradley served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (SYD)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Kentucky State Police Department, Steve Walker , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Kentucky State Police Department, Steve Walker (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Official Capacity Claims)(Arnett, Alea)
October 8, 2019 P SO no longer assigned to case pursuant to Chambers on 10/8/2019. (KJA)
September 23, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shawn Boroviak, Kim Bradley, Logan Gray, Michael Logan Howell, Kentucky State Police Department, Steve Walker; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KJA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Thomas, Nici Thomas.( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4470334) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Email from Examiner, #2 Exhibit B-Report from Examiner, #3 Exhibit C-Phone Manual, #4 Summons Boroviak, #5 Summons Bradley, #6 Summons Gray, #7 Summons Howell, #8 Summons Dept of State Police, #9 Summons Walker)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky State Police Department
Represented By: Alea Amber Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Shawn Boroviak
Represented By: Alea Amber Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Examiner Kim Bradley
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Alea Amber Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Michael Logan Howell
Represented By: Alea Amber Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Logan Gray
Represented By: Alea Amber Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Steve Walker
Represented By: Alea Amber Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nici Thomas
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thomas
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?