Gonzalez v. Shelton et al
Plaintiff: Sadiel Gonzalez
Defendant: Tommy W. Shelton, Federal Bureau of Prisons and USA
Case Number: 6:2019cv00228
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: In light of Gonzalez's representation, IT IS ORDERED that: 1) The Clerk's Office shall file Gonzalez's initial submission at DE #1 as a new docket entry in Case No. 6:18-cv-265-REW. The Clerk's Office shall also file a copy of this Order as a docket entry in that same case. 2)Since Gonzalez's initial submission will now be considered in his other case, this specific action is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/21/2019.(MM)cc: COR, pro se filer via US Mail
October 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #5 NOTICE TO AMEND CASE 6:18-CV-265 by Sadiel Gonzalez, pro se (MM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO AMEND CASE 6:18-CV-265 by Sadiel Gonzalez, pro se (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmarked 10/18/2019)(MM)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is ORDERED that, within 21 days from the entry of this Order, Gonzalez SHALL file a notice in the record indicating whether (a) he is trying to amend his complaint in Case No. 6:18-cv-265 to add additional claims and defendants, or (b) he is trying to start a whole new case based on the same set of facts at issue in his first case. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 09/24/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, pro se filer via US Mail
September 23, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Pro Se for review: #1 Complaint. (RBB)
September 23, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RBB)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(RBB)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Pro Se, filed by Sadiel Gonzalez, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope, front & back, postmarked 9/19/2019)(RBB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Shelton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy W. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadiel Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?