Jones v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marjorie Jones
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 6:2019cv00276
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MRS)
November 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: (MRS)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1) At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3) Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4) Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5) Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs).. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/19.(MRS)cc: COR, Christy Jones, David Thomas, Eric Anielak, James Keale, Jon Strongman, Kari Sutherland, Susan Robinson, William M. Gage via US Mail.
November 13, 2019 Filing 46 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:17-cv-00602. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: non-registered attorneys via US Mail
November 7, 2019 Filing 45 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (4341) Motion to Exclude Robert Moore, #2 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (4343) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Robert Moore, #3 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (4506) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Robert Moore, #4 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (4624) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Robert Moore, #5 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (6819) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Robert Moore, #6 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (6929) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Robert Moore, #7 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (7180) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Robert Moore)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (6874) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Vladmir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (6874) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Vladmir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (6874) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Vladmir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (7038) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (7045) Opposition to Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (7085) Amended Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (7183) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2806) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #9 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - ECF# 43 Continued - (2806) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #10 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2806) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #11 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2809) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #12 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2944) Part 1 Memo Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #13 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2944) Part 2 Memo Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #14 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2944) Part 3 Memo Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #15 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2944) Part 4 Memo Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #16 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (3023) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #17 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (6823) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Neeraj Kohli, #18 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (6827) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Neeraj Kohli, #19 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (7176) Notice of Adoption of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #20 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2119) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Robert Moore, #21 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2119) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Robert Moore, #22 Exhibit ECF# 43 Continued - (2120) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Robert Moore)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 43 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238) First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (239) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit (241) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit (262) Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit (4573) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit (4573) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit (4573) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit (4573) Part 4 Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit (4574) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit (4675) Part 1 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit (4675) Part 2 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit (4692) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit (6641) Notice of Adoption of Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit (6951) Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response of Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit (7120) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit (3619) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit (3619) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit (3621) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit (3790) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit (3790) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit (3790) Part 3 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit (3865) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 11/13/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 11/12/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/30/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PRETRIAL ORDER # 338 (Adoption of PTO # 329 (Dismissal of Settled and Paid Cases)) To effectively and efficiently streamline procedures and be as consistent as possible throughout MDL 2327 the court ORDERS that PTO No. 329 is ADOPTED for every case in MDL 2327 assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 5/3/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER The claims against Defendant Boston Scientific Corp. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate BSC as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 4/24/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Marjorie Jones (White, Matthew) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Boston Scientific Corporation (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER The Show Cause Orders entered on 4/10/2019 in the case on Exhibit A are VACATED; the cases on the attached Exhibit A are assigned to Chief Judge Johnston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #37 ORDER ENTERED ON 4/11/2019: SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) (Modified on 4/11/2019 to note order has been vacated) (kew). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER The #34 Order entered on 3/26/2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/27/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: cases identified on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #35 ORDER ENTERED ON 3/27/2019: ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI) (Modified on 3/28/2019 to note order has been vacated) (kew). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER The #32 Order entered on 3/20/2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/21/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #33 ORDER ENTERED 3/21/2019: ORDER granting #31 JOINT MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation, Marjorie Jones to Dismiss Boston Scientific Corporation Without Prejudice and terminate Boston Scientific Corporation from the docket of the Court, each party to bear its own costs; other defendants remain and plaintiff(s) will continue to prosecute their actions against them. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/20/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kab) (Modified on 3/21/2019 to note order has been vacated) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 31 JOINT MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation, Marjorie Jones to Dismiss Boston Scientific Corporation Without Prejudice. (Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 3/19/2019 to add party filer) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 8, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #29 Memorandum In Opposition. ERROR: Last page was missing from image. CORRECTION: Last page retained and image replaced. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Marjorie Jones in opposition to #28 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Matthew) (Modified on 11/8/2018 to correct and replace image) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment and Integrated Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Anielak, Eric)[Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 5/25/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Marjorie Jones on October 3, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing as follows: 1) The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is now extended to 10/31/2018, for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket; 2) For all cases on an inactive docket and all cases to be put on an inactive docket, the parties may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by 10/31/2018, then the court may have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket, or dismiss the cases without prejudice; and 3) All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/21/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member cases assigned to Chief Judge Johnston that is on an inactive docket) (pma) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marjorie Jones for Amended Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Levy, Jacob) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 22 NON-REVISION ELECTION FORM: Dismissing the presently pending case without prejudice pursuant to the Pretrial Order; filed by Marjorie Jones. (Levy, Jacob) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marjorie Jones for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production. (Levy, Jacob) (Modified on 6/19/2018 to covert event to certificate of service) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marjorie Jones for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Levy, Jacob) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marjorie Jones for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Levy, Jacob) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marjorie Jones for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Defendants (Levy, Jacob) (Modified on 5/21/2018 to convert event to certificate of service) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 15 ASSIGNMENT ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation: The Honorable Thomas E. Johnston is assigned as the transferee judge for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 over any actions transferred by the Panel that present recusal issues for the original transferee judge. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair for the Panel, on 5/7/2018. (cc: attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Attachment) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Marjorie Jones on 5/14/2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan J. Pope on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #10 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Thomas Mechas on 3/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Marjorie Jones. (Levy, Jacob) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 18, 2017 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (skh) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 17, 2017 Filing 4 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 246 (Order Amending PTO # 40 - Plaintiff Fact Sheet) entered on 12/09/2016 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jk) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 17, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Marjorie Jones for Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Short Form Complaint (Levy, Jacob) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 17, 2017 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Johnson & Johnson) (bw) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 16, 2017 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-5251406. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak
Represented By: James H. Keale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Jones
Represented By: Matthew L. White
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Jacob E. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?