Popejoy v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Joseph Popejoy
Defendant: Det. Bryan Lawson, Sgt. Chris Edwards and Sgt. Brett Reeves
Case Number: 6:2019cv00284
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MM)
December 2, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
December 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (CBD)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:19-cv-00809. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to Popejoy via US Mail
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 12/2/2019: The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Southern Division, at London. cc: Plaintiff (pro se), EDKY- Clerk (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 12/2/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 11/14/2019. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b) (1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 12/2/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/2/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Joseph Popejoy (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/2/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Edwards, Bryan Lawson, Brett Reeves, filed by Anthony Joseph Popejoy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope) (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Popejoy v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Joseph Popejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Bryan Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Chris Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Brett Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?