Scalia v. Sagebrush of Kentucky, LLC
Petitioner: Eugene Scalia
Respondent: Sagebrush of Kentucky, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00046
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #4 Order to Show Cause. (KJA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia via hand delivery to registered agent of Sagebrush of Kentucky, LLC (Shepherd, Matt) Added text on 4/3/2020 (SYD).
April 2, 2020 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #5 Summons Returned Executed was an INCOMPLETE PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Summons Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia via hand delivery to registered agent within seven (7) calendar days. *MRS* cc: COR (KJA)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 STRICKEN FROM THE DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 4/2/2020. Modified on 4/2/2020 (KJA).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE:The Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor, has filed a petition to enforce an administrative subpoena duces tecum [R. #1 ]. The Court has reviewed the petition and the documents submitted in conjunction with the petition. The Court finds that it is appropriate to issue a show cause order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows:1. The Respondent, Sagebrush of Kentucky, LLC, SHALL show cause, within twenty (20) days from entry of this Order, why the Secretary's petition should not be granted. 2. Failure to respond to this Order within twenty (20) days may constitute grounds to grant the Secretary's petition. Show Cause Response due by 4/20/2020.Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/31/20.(RBB)cc: COR andSagebrush of Kentucky, LLC, by US Mail.
February 25, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sagebrush of Kentucky, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KJA)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Petition for Enforcement of Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum, #2 Affidavit of Wage Hour Investigator, #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons as to Sagebrush of Kentucky, LLC)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Sagebrush of Kentucky, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Matt S. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sagebrush of Kentucky, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?