Daniels et al v. Laurel County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Glenda Johnson
Defendant: Jamie Mosley and Laurel County, Kentucky
Executor: Edgar Daniels
Case Number: 6:2020cv00134
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER (civil): 1) the following ddlns shall be observed: a) Initial disclosures by 8/31/20 These need not be filed in the Court record; b) Discovery. i. Fact Discovery by 11/1/21; and ii. Expert discovery nlt 11/1/21; c. Supplementation as stated. Supplemental disclosures & responses need not be filed in the Court record; d. Motions to join addl parties or amend pleadings nlt 2/15/21 e. Identity of expert witnesses and written reports: i. Pla -6/15/21; and ii. Dft 8/16/21; These need not be filed in the Court record f. Dispositive motions and motions objecting to the admissibility of expert testimony nlt 1/17/22, w/response & reply time per Rule; 2. Parties to observe FRCivP 5(d) directives; 3. PTC before the undersigned on 6/7/22 at 9:00 a.m. at London. 4. NLT 21 days prior to ptc, counsel shall file the filing: a. wit & exh list as stated; b. motions in limine; c. evid depos to be used at trial; d. pt memo as stated; e. proposed agreed jury instructions; and f. proposed voir dire. 5. NLT 14 days before ptc: a. written objs; b. responses to motion in limine; c. responses to any motion for ruling. 6. At ptc, counsel shall be prepared to: a. make possible stipulations of admissibility; b. disclose demo or summary exhs; c. display all exhs to be used at trial; d. discuss possibility of settlement; e. advise Court of anticipated tech issues; 7. NLT 7 working days prior to trial counsel shall submit to Chambers a copy of each doc exh. 8. TRIAL BY JURY on 7/12/22 at 9:30 a.m. at London. Counsel present by 9:00 a.m. Anticipated length 4 days. 9. Referred to MJ Hanly A. Ingram to: a. resolve all non-dispositive motions; b. manage discovery; c. manage pt sched issues; d. Conduct mid-discovery telephonic conference; e. conduct settlement conference. 10. Discovery disputes as stated. 11. Modification of this schedule is unlikely & will occur only for good cause. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2021. Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 2/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2022. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 6/7/2022 at 09:00 AM in LONDON before Judge Claria Horn Boom. JURY TRIAL set for 7/12/2022 at 09:30 AM, counsel at 9:00 AM in LONDON before Judge Claria Horn Boom. Four Days. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/18/20.(SYD)cc: COR
August 10, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MM)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Graham, Curt)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Parties meet within 21 days; 2) Within 14 days after the meeting, cnsl shall FILE a written report outlining the proposed discovery plan the report shall include information as defined within (a-o); 3) Any party required to file a disclosure statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 that has not already done so, shall file same at the time of the parties' joint status report. Rule 26 Meeting Report due as stated within this order. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/28/2020.(MM)cc: COR (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2020: #1 MJ Consent Form) (MM).
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Laurel County, Kentucky, Jamie Mosley.(Graham, Curt)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurel County, Kentucky, Jamie Mosley. (Graham, Curt)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurel County, Kentucky, Jamie Mosley. (Stansbury, Casey)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edgar Daniels via Constable to Jamie Mosley served on 7/4/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service - Jamie Mosley)(Croley, Paul)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edgar Daniels via Constable to Laurel County, Kentucky served on 7/3/2020, answer due 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service)(Croley, Paul)
June 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram added. P SO no longer assigned to case. Per Chambers request (SYD)
June 25, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Laurel County, Kentucky, Jamie Mosley; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SYD)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Edgar Daniels, Glenda Johnson. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4704552) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Laurel County, #3 Summons Jamie Mosley)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels et al v. Laurel County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Mosley
Represented By: Curt Matthew Graham
Represented By: Casey Cavanaugh Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel County, Kentucky
Represented By: Curt Matthew Graham
Represented By: Casey Cavanaugh Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Edgar Daniels
Represented By: Paul K. Croley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Johnson
Represented By: Paul K. Croley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?