Hatmaker et al v. Rockcastle County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Downs and Tristan Winstead
Defendant: Nathan Carter, Rockcastle County, Kentucky, Suzanne Smith, Amy (Last Name Unknown), Josie Adams, Ashley (Last Name Unknown), Tim Poynter, Cathy Gregg, Brad Johnson, Rockcastle County Detention Center Medical Director, Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Jana Robinson and Elisha (Last Name Unknown)
Executor: Lucy Hatmaker
Case Number: 6:2021cv00094
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, , ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Tim Poynter.(Shockley, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, , ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, by Josie Adams, Nathan Carter, Cathy Gregg, Brad Johnson, Jana Robinson, Rockcastle County, Kentucky, Suzanne Smith.(Stilz, D.)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Wayne Downs, Lucy Hatmaker, Tristan Winstead re #6 Amended Complaint (Bentley, Aaron)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 REDACTED COMPLAINT See DE #1 against All Defendants, filed by Tristan Winstead, Lucy Hatmaker, Wayne Downs.(Bentley, Aaron) Modified document descriptionon 6/8/2021 (MRS).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Complaint: 1. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the Complaint [R. 1] under SEAL. 2. Plaintiffs' counsel of record SHALL file a redacted version of the Complaint [R. 1]. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/3/2021.(MM)cc: COR
June 2, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. P SO no longer assigned to the case. (APR)
June 2, 2021 Conflict Check run. (APR)
June 2, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint, (APR)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Amy (Last Name Unknown), Ashley (Last Name Unknown), Elisha (Last Name Unknown), Josie Adams, Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Nathan Carter, Cathy Gregg, Brad Johnson, Tim Poynter, Jana Robinson, Rockcastle County Detention Center Medical Director, Rockcastle County, Kentucky, Suzanne Smith; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons - Nathan Carter, #2 Summons - Brad Johnson, #3 Summons - Josie Adams, #4 Summons - Jana Robinson, #5 Summons - Cathy Gregg, #6 Summons - Suzanne Smith, #7 Summons - Advanced Correctional Healthcare, #8 Summons - Rockcastle Co. Detention Center Medical Director, #9 Summons - Tim Poynter, #10 Summons - Amy (Last Name Unknown), #11 Summons - Ashley (Last Name Unknown), #12 Summons - Elisha (Last Name Unknown))(APR)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4983546), filed by Tristan Winstead, Lucy Hatmaker, Wayne Downs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Order Appointing Lucy Hatmaker as Administratrix, #3 Summons - Rockcastle County, Kentucky, Nathan Carter, Brad Johnson, Josie Adams, Jana Robinson, Cathy Gregg, Suzanne Smith, Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Rockcastle Co. Detention Center Medical Director, Tim Poynter, Amy (Last Name Unknown), Ashley (Last Name Unknown), Elisha (Last Name Unknown))(APR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatmaker et al v. Rockcastle County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Carter
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockcastle County, Kentucky
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Smith
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy (Last Name Unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josie Adams
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley (Last Name Unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Poynter
Represented By: John Forcht Shockley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Gregg
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Johnson
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockcastle County Detention Center Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare
Represented By: John Forcht Shockley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Robinson
Represented By: D. Barry Stilz
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisha (Last Name Unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Downs
Represented By: David M. Schuler, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Bentley
Represented By: Camille Bathurst
Represented By: Gregory Allen Belzley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan Winstead
Represented By: David M. Schuler, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Bentley
Represented By: Camille Bathurst
Represented By: Gregory Allen Belzley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Lucy Hatmaker
Represented By: David M. Schuler, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Bentley
Represented By: Camille Bathurst
Represented By: Gregory Allen Belzley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?