Asher et al v. Clay County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Asher, Shawn Smith, Carol Jean Miller, E.G. Miller, Richard Asher, Polly Brooks, Rob Miller, Ronda Dean White, Anita Miller, Patricia Goodrum, Joyce A. Miller, Ronald Wayne Miller, Gordon Miller, Deborah Bray, Roma Asher Neat, Jill Harris Morris, Pamela Hoskins, Lyn Hacker, Lewis Asher, Jr., Angela Hacker, Betty Ann Hacker, Linda Sibley, Sherry Baker, Dennie Sizemore, Charlotte Dykes Sizemore, Brooke Sizemore, William Charles Tyler Sizemore, Margaret Ann Sizemore Buttram, Bill Ed Sizemore, Paul Bray, Mary Hall, Marquetta Sizemore Hensley, Walter Sizemore, Megan Honeycutt, Barbara Ann Finley, TJ Finley, Alma Finley, Cecil Ray Martin, Hester Martin Brinkley, Jesse Robinson, Emma Homgren, C. Jerry Merida-McCall, Clint Merida, Jr., Malvery Roberts Begley, Vickie Nunn Cadle, Betty J. Finger, Kathy Jamison, Terry Legel, Evelyn Lewis Reynolds, Judge Linda Roberts Sibley, Chief James Quietwolf Sizemore, Molly Sizemore and Roseann Terrill
Defendant: Clay County Board of Education, CCBOE, Mark Hoskins, Roy Glenn Allen, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Anthony Lovett, Clay County Fiscal Court, Johnny Johnson, Manchester Memorial Gardens and Attorney General Daniel Cameron
Case Number: 6:2021cv00124
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 25 U.S.C. ยง 640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 38 REPLY to #35 , #36 PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO COURTS SHOW CAUSE ORDER filed by Dennis Asher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(House, Stella)
September 13, 2021 Filing 37 FIRST MOTION for Order by Dennis Asher for Entry by Surveyor to Relevant Cemetery Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Entry by Surveyor)(House, Stella)
September 10, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Johnny Johnson, Clay County Fiscal Court #34 , #33 filed by Johnny Johnson, Clay County Fiscal Court. (Williams, Jason)
September 8, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #34 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett, Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett. (Deener, Elizabeth) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (MM).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE re #33 Response to Order to Show Cause: 1. The response deadline to Plaintiffs Response to Court's Show Cause Order [R. 33]SHALL BE EXPEDITED. The response of Defendants, if any, shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, September 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/3/2021.(MM)cc: COR
September 2, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Dennis Asher #32 , #29 to Grant Leave for Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint, Deny Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and Deem Defendants Served by Constructive Notice filed by Dennis Asher. (House, Stella)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, and the Court being otherwise sufficiently advised, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this third amendment of the complaint should be permitted by the Court. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/1/2021.(MM)cc: COR
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #30 FIRST MOTION for Order by Dennis Asher to Deem Parties Served: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Deem Defendants Served [R. 30] is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for disposition. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/1/2021.(MM)cc: COR
August 31, 2021 Filing 30 FIRST MOTION for Order by Dennis Asher to Deem Parties Served Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Deem Parties Served)(House, Stella)
August 31, 2021 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis Asher.(House, Stella)
August 30, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett (MM)
August 27, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett filed by Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett. (Deener, Elizabeth)
August 26, 2021 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett , #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, Verified Affidavit of Darrell W. Peters in Opposition to Motion To Dismiss (R.20) by Dennis Asher. (House, Stella)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time: 1. Defendants Clay County Fiscal Court and County Judge Executive Johnny Johnsons Motion for Extension of Time [R. 22] is GRANTED. 2. Defendants Clay County Fiscal Court and County Judge Executive Johnny Johnson will be allowed up to and including twenty-one (21) days after the entry of this Courts Order as to the pending Amended Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief [R. 7] in which to file an answer or responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/24/2021.(MM)cc: COR
August 23, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, Verified Affidavit of James QuietWolf Sizemore with DNA test by James Quietwolf Sizemore. (House, Stella)
August 20, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE (R. 19) AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (R. 20) filed by Dennis Asher. (House, Stella)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time: Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' response deadline SHALL BE EXPEDITED. Plaintiffs SHALL file a response to Defendants' Motion before Thursday, August 19, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/16/2021.(MM)cc: COR
August 13, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time by Clay County Fiscal Court, Johnny Johnson, Johnny Johnson Motion for extension of time Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Extension of Time)(Williams, Jason)
August 13, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Amended Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief by Angela Hacker, #4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief by Angela Hacker Supplemental Response filed by Clay County Fiscal Court, Johnny Johnson, Johnny Johnson. (Williams, Jason)
August 12, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 8: dpbray photos accessed August 7, 2021, #3 Proposed Order)(Deener, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Amended Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief by Angela Hacker, #4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief by Angela Hacker Supplemental per DE 17 filed by Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 5: Application to Fiscal Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 6: Fiscal Court Resolution, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 7: Application for Permits, #4 Proposed Order)(Deener, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2021 Party Malvery Roberts Begley, Vickie Nunn Cadle, Daniel Cameron, Betty J. Finger, Kathy Jamison, Terry Legel, Evelyn Lewis Reynolds, Linda Roberts Sibley, James Quietwolf Sizemore, Molly Sizemore and Roseann Terrill added per Second Amended Complaint at DE #18 . Party Bill Ed Sizemore, Walter Sizemore, Mary Hall and Megan Honeycutt terminated per Second Amended Complaint at DE #18 . (MM)
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis Asher.(House, Stella)
July 29, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/29/2021, before Judge Claria Horn Boom: re #4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief by Angela Hacker, #7 Amended Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief by Angela Hacker. 1. Defendants SHALL submit any supplemental response to Plaintiffs Motion (or other responsive pleading) on or before Friday, August 13, 2021.2. Any reply (or response) by Plaintiffs SHALL be filed on or before Friday, August 20, 2021, at which time the matter will stand submitted to the Court.3. The parties agree to maintain the status quo until the Court rules on the pending Motion. (Court Reporter Kimberley Keene.) Signed by Claria H. Boom. (SYD)cc: COR
July 29, 2021 Party Charlotte Dykes Sizemore, Dennie Sizemore, William Charles Tyler Sizemore, Manchester Memorial Gardens and Brooke Sizemore terminated. (Parties not named in the First Amended Complaint, DE #16) (SYD)
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Dennis Asher, Lewis Asher, Jr, Richard Asher, Sherry Baker, Deborah Bray, Paul Bray, Hester Martin Brinkley, Polly Brooks, Margaret Ann Sizemore Buttram, Alma Finley, Barbara Ann Finley, TJ Finley, Patricia Goodrum, Angela Hacker, Betty Ann Hacker, Lyn Hacker, Mary Hall, Marquetta Sizemore Hensley, Emma Homgren, Megan Honeycutt, Pamela Hoskins, Cecil Ray Martin, Clint Merida, Jr, C. Jerry Merida-McCall, Anita Miller, Carol Jean Miller, E.G. Miller, Gordon Miller, Joyce A. Miller, Rob Miller, Ronald Wayne Miller, Jill Harris Morris, Roma Asher Neat, Jesse Robinson, Linda Sibley, Bill Ed Sizemore, Walter Sizemore, Shawn Smith, Ronda Dean White by Dennis Asher. (House, Stella) Modified texton 7/30/2021 (SYD).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DELAYING AND RESETTING TIME OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: This matter is before the Court on the Court's own motion. Because of a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Court must delay today's telephonic conference. Accordingly,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE currently scheduled for Thursday, July 29, 2021, at the hour of 4:00 p.m., is DELAYED and RESCHEDULED to begin on the same date, Thursday, 7/29/2021 at 04:30 PM in LONDON before Judge Claria Horn Boom. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/29/2021.(MM)cc: COR, LON D
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #4 filed by Clay County Fiscal Court, Johnny Johnson, Johnny Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resolution)(Kelley, John)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 EX PARTE MOTION by Angela Hacker filed by Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Clay County Fiscal Court, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1: Deed, #2 Exhibit Ex 2: Permits, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3: White Top Newsletter Article, #4 Exhibit Ex 4: Fed Register, #5 Proposed Order)(Deener, Elizabeth)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #7 EX PARTE MOTION by Angela Hacker Affidavit of Gordon Miller by Gordon Miller. (House, Stella)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #7 EX PARTE MOTION by Angela Hacker Verified Affidavit of Brooke Sizemore by Brooke Sizemore. (House, Stella)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR EX PARTE TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/29/2021 before Judge Claria Horn Boom: Counsel appeared, as noted, for a hearing on the Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief [R. #4 ]. Counsel advised no objection to filing all ex parte entries in this matter as public record entries. After hearing statements and arguments of counsel, the Court ORDERS as follows: 1. For the reasons stated on the record, and with agreement from the Plaintiffs, the Clerk SHALL UNSEAL Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [R. 4], the Court's Ex Parte Order [R. #6 ], Plaintiffs' Amended Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief [R. #7 ], and Plaintiffs' Affidavit [R. #8 ].2. A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE is SET for 7/29/2021 at 04:00 PM in LONDON before Judge Claria Horn Boom. The parties are directed to call 888-363-4735, using access code 9522526. Please dial in a few minutes before the conference is scheduled to begin. 3. The Court advises all parties that it expects the status quo to be maintained in the period before the Telephonic Conference. (Court Reporter Kimberley Keene.) Signed by Claria Horn Boom. (MM)cc: COR, LON D
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Stella B. House re: Certification of Attempted Notice by Angela Hacker. (House, Stella)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #7 EX PARTE MOTION by Angela Hacker Corrected Affidavit of Darrell W. Peters by Angela Hacker. (House, Stella)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Angela Hacker(Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Angela Hacker, #2 Exhibit Exhibits of Margaret, #3 Exhibit Application to relocate Cemetery, #4 Exhibit Notice in newspaper of intent to relocate Cemetery, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Darrell W. Peters, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Margaret Buttram)(House, Stella) Modified to unseal pursuant to DE #10 on 7/29/2021 (MM). Modified motion text on 7/29/2021 (KJA).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EX PARTE ORDER re #4 EX PARTE MOTION by Angela Hacker. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/27/2021.(MM)cc: Service by Email to plaintiff. Modified on unseal pursuant to DE #10 7/29/2021 (MM).
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anna Deener on behalf of Roy Glenn Allen, Roy Glenn Allen, Clay County Board of Education, Robin Combs, Robin Combs, Leewood Cornett, Leewood Cornett, Mark Hoskins, Mark Hoskins, Anthony Lovett, Anthony Lovett (Deener, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Angela Hacker (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Angela Hacker, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(House, Stella) Modified to unseal pursuant to DE #10 on 7/29/2021 (MM). Modified motion text on 7/29/2021 (KJA).
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Kelley, Jr on behalf of Clay County Fiscal Court (Kelley, John)
July 26, 2021 Conflict Check run. (APR)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5025442), filed by Dennis Asher, Lewis Asher, Jr, Richard Asher, Sherry Baker, Deborah Bray, Paul Bray, Hester Martin Brinkley, Polly Brooks, Margaret Ann Sizemore Buttram, Alma Finley, Barbara Ann Finley, TJ Finley, Patricia Goodrum, Angela Hacker, Betty Ann Hacker, Lyn Hacker, Mary Hall, Marquetta Sizemore Hensley, Emma Homgren, Megan Honeycutt, Pamela Hoskins, Cecil Ray Martin, Clint Merida, Jr, C. Jerry Merida-McCall, Anita Miller, Carol Jean Miller, E.G. Miller, Gordon Miller, Joyce A. Miller, Rob Miller, Ronald Wayne Miller, Jill Harris Morris, Roma Asher Neat, Jesse Robinson, Linda Sibley, Bill Ed Sizemore, Brooke Sizemore, Charlotte Dykes Sizemore, Dennie Sizemore, Walter Sizemore, William Charles Tyler Sizemore, Shawn Smith, Ronda Dean White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Hoskins Cemetery Graves, #2 Exhibit 2 - 07/14/2021 Clay County Fiscal Court Resolution Authorizing Removal and Relocation of All Graves in Hoskins Cemetery, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1978 Deed from Melvin Hoskins to Cloyd Hoskins, Estill Hoskins, and Ford Hoskins, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(APR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asher et al v. Clay County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay County Board of Education
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCBOE
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hoskins
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Glenn Allen
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Combs
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leewood Cornett
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lovett
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay County Fiscal Court
Represented By: John F. Kelley, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Johnson
Represented By: Jason E. Williams
Represented By: John F. Kelley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester Memorial Gardens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Daniel Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Asher
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Smith
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Jean Miller
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.G. Miller
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Asher
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly Brooks
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Miller
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Dean White
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Miller
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Goodrum
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce A. Miller
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wayne Miller
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Miller
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bray
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roma Asher Neat
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Harris Morris
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Hoskins
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyn Hacker
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Asher, Jr.
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hacker
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Hacker
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sibley
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Baker
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennie Sizemore
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Dykes Sizemore
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Sizemore
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Charles Tyler Sizemore
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Ann Sizemore Buttram
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Ed Sizemore
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bray
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hall
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquetta Sizemore Hensley
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Sizemore
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Honeycutt
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Finley
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TJ Finley
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Finley
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Ray Martin
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hester Martin Brinkley
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Robinson
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Homgren
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Jerry Merida-McCall
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Merida, Jr.
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malvery Roberts Begley
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Nunn Cadle
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J. Finger
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Jamison
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Legel
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Lewis Reynolds
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judge Linda Roberts Sibley
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief James Quietwolf Sizemore
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Sizemore
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseann Terrill
Represented By: Stella House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?