Harris v. SSA
Plaintiff: John P. Harris
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv00160
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: 1. Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; 2. Secretary file response w/in 90 days; 3. extensions may be granted only upon showing of good cause. 3. Motions governed by LR 7.1. 4. extensions may be granted only upon showing of good cause. 5. Nothing shall preclude judge from hearing oral argument. 6. Clerk file this Order in all SSA actions when answer is filed. 7. This GO supersedes GO 09-13. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/24/2013.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/24/13.(JLC)cc: COR
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Transcript - Social Security)(Morgan, Cheryl)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (USM 285 Form) Returned Executed by John P. Harris via certified mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 9/30/2021. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via certified mail on 9/23/21; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via certified mail on 9/30/21. (SYD)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2021: #1 Receipt) (KJA).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1. The plaintiff's motion [Record No. #1 ] is GRATNED. The plaintiff may proceed herein without the payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 09/21/2021. (KJA)cc: COR
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT, filed by John P. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM Form 285, #3 Summons as to SSA, #4 Summons as to U.S. Attorney EDKy, #5 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General)(KJA)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John P. Harris (KJA)
September 20, 2021 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
September 20, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John P. Harris (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Harris
Represented By: Ronald C. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?