Rice v. Logan et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Clay Rice
Defendant: Duane Logan, Mark Logan, Finley Thomas and Corbin Independent School District
Case Number: 6:2021cv00206
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Corbin Independent School District filed by Corbin Independent School District. (Langdon, Douglas)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Corbin Independent School District (SYD)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Parties exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 2/4/2022. These need not be filed in the Court record. Supplementation due as stated. 2. Motions to join additional parties or amend pleadings by 8/5/2022. 3. Fact discovery by 10/25/2022. By 11/28/2022, Pla disclose expert witnesses who may be used at trial, Dfts by 12/15/2022. Expert depos by 1/15/2023. Dispositive and Daubert motions by 2/15/2023. Response and reply time per local rule. 6. Per Judge Wier's referral order (D.E. #3 ), upon resolution of any summary judgment motion or expiration of deadlines, Judge Wier will set other deadlines. 7. Schedule built on party input, modification is thus disfavored and will only occur under Rule 16 and/or Rule 6, as applicable. 8. Other than the agreed-upon discovery limits within the parties' Rule 26(f) report, the default limits within the discovery rules apply. 9. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 6/10/2022 at 11:30 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. To join the teleconference, the parties are DIRECTED to call AT&T Teleconferencing at 1-888-675-2535, to enter Access Code 8810053 (followed by "#"), and, when requested, enter the Security Code 21206 (followed by "#"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 01/25/2022.(KJA)cc: COR Aris Rogers via US Mail, London Diary Modified text on 1/25/2022 (KJA).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: #15 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KJA)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Langdon, Douglas)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Aris Rogers: re #14 Answer to Complaint. An e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Aris Rogers (KJA)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO Bradford Breeding re #14 Answer to Complaint; Error: the pleading was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJA) Modified file date on 1/21/2022 (KJA).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Duane Logan.(Breeding, Bradford)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Finley Thomas.(KJA)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF #11 Response in Opposition re #8 Motion to Dismiss by Corbin Independent School District filed by Daniel Clay Rice. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Final Revised Memo Response, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Sustaining)(Wren, James) Modified text, termed motion, linked to response and added the corrected Memorandum in Support to the Response at DE #11 pursuant to QC on 1/19/2022 (KJA).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Corbin Independent School District filed by Daniel Clay Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- Letter to Plaintiff 10-7-21, #2 Proposed Order)(Wren, James) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (SLH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2022: #3 CORRECTED Memorandum Response in Opposition to City's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) (KJA).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court GRANTS DE #9 . The individual Defendants (Duane Logan, Mark Logan, and Finley Thomas) shall file any responsive pleadings and motions to the Complaint no later than January 20, 2022. Plaintiff shall file a response to DE #8 no later than January 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 01/04/2022.(KJA)cc: COR - Eric Dixon via Mail. Modified to text on 1/20/2022 (KJA).
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order by Daniel Clay Rice. (Wren, James)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Corbin Independent School District (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Langdon, Douglas) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (SLH).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Mark Logan.(Davies, Samuel)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR FEE REFUND TO CREDIT CARD by Corbin Independent School District . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Receipts from Filing Fees)(Langdon, Douglas)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF FEE REFUND APPROVED re #6 Request for Fee Refund ; the fee transaction involving Receipt No. AKYEDC-5148902 having been erroneously paid, the Clerk APPROVES the refund by processing a credit through the electronic credit card system. The credit refund transaction in the amount of $ $402.00 was successfully completed on 12/21/21 at 9:56 AM. cc: COR (SYD)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet either in person or by telephone to consider Rule 26(f)(2) topics. (2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: a-e. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge Form)(APR)cc: COR
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 "STRICKEN FROM THE DOCKET": Incorrect Document--Pursuant to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 12/20/21. (Langdon, Douglas) Modified on 12/20/2021 (SYD).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #4 Request for Fee Refund was an INCORRECT PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Request within seven (7) calendar days. *SKV* cc: COR (SYD)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/2019.(JLC)cc: COR
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whitley Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00512. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5148935), filed by Mark Logan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(JLC)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Logan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Clay Rice
Represented By: James H. Wren, II
Represented By: Leroy Arlis Gilbert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Logan
Represented By: Bradford L. Breeding
Represented By: Aris L. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Logan
Represented By: Samuel G. Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finley Thomas
Represented By: Eric M. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbin Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Howard O. Mann
Represented By: Samuel W. Wardle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?