North American Business Association, LLC v. United Merchant Services Club, LLC et al
Plaintiff: North American Business Association, LLC
Defendant: Nicholas Ahlf, United Merchant Services Club, LLC, Nicholas Taylor and Nicholas Taylor Lain
Case Number: 6:2022cv00085
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 14 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLC)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Court finds good cause and HEREBY GRANTS Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #11 by Nicholas Ahlf. Defendant Ahlf SHALL FILE his answer or other responsive pleading- whether or not he retains counsel- on or before July 18, 2022. No further extension will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/18/22. (JLC)cc: CORand Nicholas Ahlf, Pro Se by US Mail
May 18, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Nicholas Ahlf Answer deadline changed to July 18, 2022 per Order at DE #13 . (JLC)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/06/2016.(KJA)cc: COR and Nicholas Ahlf by US Mail
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time for 60-days to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nicholas Ahlf, pro se. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (KJA)
May 11, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by North American Business Association, LLC as to Nicholas Ahlf. (summons received from the Whitley County Sheriff's Department) (SYD)
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Business Association, LLC via certified mail to United Merchant Services Club, LLC served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Receipt certified mail return receipt)(Effinger, Cynthia) Modified text on 5/5/2022 (JMB).
May 3, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Business Association, LLC via certified mail to Nicholas Ahlf served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Receipt certified mail return receipt)(Effinger, Cynthia)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 **INCORRECTLY FILED (Wrong PDF uploaded) - SEE DE #9 FOR THE CORRECT ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Business Association, LLC via certified mail to United Merchant Services Club, LLC served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Receipt certified mail return receipt)(Effinger, Cynthia) Modified on 5/5/2022 to state incorrectly filed. Clerk talked to atty who advised they uploaded the wrong PDF and would re-file the correct document. (JMB).
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. cc: form e-mailed to Register. (KJA)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/19.(JLC)cc: COR
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nicholas Ahlf, United Merchant Services Club, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Nicholas Ahlf)(JLC)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North American Business Association, LLC. (JLC)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5244196), filed by North American Business Association, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Nicholas Ahlf, #3 Summons United Merchant Services Club, LLC)(JLC) Modified text on 4/15/2022 (JLC).
April 15, 2022 Conflict Check run. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Business Association, LLC v. United Merchant Services Club, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Ahlf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Merchant Services Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Taylor Lain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Business Association, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Shawn Fox
Represented By: Cynthia L. Effinger
Represented By: Peter J. Rosene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?