Wainscott v. Member Select Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Harry Wainscott and Paula Wainscott
Defendant: Julia Marie Lorencz, James Morrow, Member Select Insurance Company, Julia Lorrencs, Julia Lorence, Julia Lorencs, Michael J. Curtin & Associates, AAA The Auto Group and Mac Morrow
Case Number: 6:2022cv00215
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f) (2) mandates. (2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: see items a-f. Consent form attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 11/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge Form)(JMB)cc: COR
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY A. Riley Grant by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 L.R. 83.1 Packet, #2 L.R. 83.2)(APR)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER In re: Civil Actions: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/4/2021.(APR)cc: COR
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Member Select Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto Club Insurance Association for Member Select Insurance Company.. (Klapheke, David)
November 15, 2022 Conflict Check run. (APR)
November 10, 2022 AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Julia Marie Lorencz - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 . (APR)
November 10, 2022 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Julia Marie Lorencz - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 .(APR)
November 10, 2022 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Member Select Insurance Company - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 .(APR) Modified text on 11/15/2022 (APR).
November 10, 2022 ANSWER to Complaint and First Amended Complaint by James Morrow - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 .(APR)
November 10, 2022 MOTION for Warning Order Attorney by Harry Wainscott - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 . (APR)
November 10, 2022 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for Summary Judgment by James Morrow - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 . (APR)
November 10, 2022 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Julia Marie Lorencz, Member Select Insurance Company, filed by Harry Wainscott - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 . (APR) Modified text on 11/15/2022 (APR).
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pulaski Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00769 ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5410244) filed by Julia Marie Lorencz. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(APR)
November 10, 2022 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Julia Marie Lorencz, Member Select Insurance Company filed by Harry Wainscott - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 . (APR)
November 10, 2022 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Member Select Insurance Company - Filed in State Court Record - See #1 .(APR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wainscott v. Member Select Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Marie Lorencz
Represented By: A. Riley Grant
Represented By: Andrew M. Palmer
Represented By: Shannon Marie Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Morrow
Represented By: Bradly Edward Moore
Represented By: Diane Rose Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Select Insurance Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Lorrencs
Represented By: A. Riley Grant
Represented By: Andrew M. Palmer
Represented By: Shannon Marie Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Lorence
Represented By: Andrew M. Palmer
Represented By: A. Riley Grant
Represented By: Shannon Marie Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Lorencs
Represented By: A. Riley Grant
Represented By: Andrew M. Palmer
Represented By: Shannon Marie Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Curtin & Associates
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA The Auto Group
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac Morrow
Represented By: Bradly Edward Moore
Represented By: Diane Rose Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Wainscott
Represented By: Brandon Wade Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Wainscott
Represented By: Brandon Wade Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?